PHL Variable Insurance v. Sheldon Hathaway Family Trust, The et al

Plaintiff: PHL Variable Insurance
Defendant: Sheldon Hathaway Family Trust, The and David Hathaway
Case Number: 2:2010cv00067
Filed: January 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 128 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 131 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/02/2013. (tls)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 3/15/12 (alt)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 82 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 3/14/12 (alt)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 51 Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum; granting 51 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 7/15/11 (alt)
February 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 02/18/2011. (asp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHL Variable Insurance v. Sheldon Hathaway Family Trust, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHL Variable Insurance
Represented By: Mark O. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheldon Hathaway Family Trust, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hathaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?