Holman v. New York Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Daryl P. Holman
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company and Nylink Insurance Agency
Case Number: 2:2010cv00490
Filed: May 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM DECISION that Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay $27,613 to Defendant NYL for a reasonable attorney fee. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/17/12. (ss)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 138 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting 140 Motion Pursuant to Rule 58(e); granting 141 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 143 Motion for Reconsideration of 126 Order. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/26/12 (alt)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 127 Motion for Entry of Judgment and Award of Costs as Prevailing Party ; denying 128 Plaintiffs Request for Award of Costs or Apportionment of Costs. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 05/15/2012. (asp)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying as moot 55 Motion for Entry of Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 62 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 62 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; denying as moot 74 Motion for Protective Order; denying 106 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 112 Motion to Strike; granting 117 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 01/26/2012. (tls)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying as moot 34 Motion to Deposit Funds ; granting 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 05/17/2011. (asp)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 11 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/12/2010. (las)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holman v. New York Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl P. Holman
Represented By: Derek A. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael K. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nylink Insurance Agency
Represented By: Michael K. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?