Izzy Poco v. Springdale, Town of et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Izzy Poco
Defendant: Springdale, Town of, Joe Barker, Pat Cluff, John Callahan, Colin Dockstader, Louise Excell, Stanley J. Smith, Robert J. Warren, Kathy LaFave, Richard Wixom, Tomas Dansie, Fay Cope, Steve Masefield, Tom Haraden, Paul Mailoux, David Rutz, Snow Jensen & Reece and Christine Wolken
Case Number: 2:2010cv00559
Filed: June 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2010 Filing 41 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Tom Haraden served on 6/23/2010, answer due 7/14/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 40 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Christine Wolken served on 6/19/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 39 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Richard Wixom served on 6/20/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 38 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Robert J. Warren served on 6/20/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 37 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Snow Jensen & Reece served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 36 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Stanley J. Smith served on 6/19/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 35 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to David Rutz served on 6/19/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 34 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Steve Masefield served on 6/19/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 33 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Paul Mailoux served on 6/19/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 32 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Kathy LaFave served on 6/19/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 31 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Louise Excell served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 30 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Colin Dockstader served on 6/21/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 29 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Tomas Dansie served on 6/19/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 28 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Fay Cope served on 6/19/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 27 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Pat Cluff served on 6/22/2010, answer due 7/13/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 26 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to John Callahan served on 6/19/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 25 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Joe Barker served on 6/19/2010, answer due 7/12/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 23, 2010 Filing 24 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Izzy Poco as to Springdale, Town of served on 6/22/2010, answer due 7/13/2010. (Stucki, Clay)
June 18, 2010 Filing 23 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Snow Jensen & Reece. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tls)
June 18, 2010 Filing 22 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Tom Haraden. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Colin Dockstader. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 20 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Springdale, Town of. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 19 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Christine Wolken. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to David Rutz. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Paul Mailoux. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Steve Masefield. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Fay Cope. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 14 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Tomas Dansie. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 13 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard Wixom. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 12 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert J. Warren. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 11 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kathy LaFave. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Stanley J. Smith. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Louise Excell. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to John Callahan. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Pat Cluff. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 18, 2010 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Joe Barker. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (kpf)
June 17, 2010 Filing 5 EXHIBITS filed by Izzy Poco re 2 Complaint . (Stucki, Clay) Modified on 6/18/2010 linked Exhibit to the correct document (las).
June 17, 2010 Filing 4 EXHIBITS filed by Izzy Poco re 2 Complaint. (Stucki, Clay) Modified on 6/18/2010 linked Exhibit to the correct document(las).
June 17, 2010 Filing 3 EXHIBITS filed by Izzy Poco re 2 Complaint (Stucki, Clay) Modified on 6/18/2010 linked exhibit to the correct document(las).
June 17, 2010 Filing 2 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Joe Barker, John Callahan, Pat Cluff, Fay Cope, Tomas Dansie, Colin Dockstader, Louise Excell, Tom Haraden, Kathy LaFave, Paul Mailoux, Steve Masefield, David Rutz, Stanley J. Smith, Snow Jensen & Reece, Springdale, Town of, Robert J. Warren, Richard Wixom, Christine Wolken (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 1088-1138111), filed by Izzy Poco. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Stucki, Clay)
June 17, 2010 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff Izzy Poco is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 350.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Izzy Poco v. Springdale, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Izzy Poco
Represented By: Jaryl L. Rencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springdale, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Cluff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Dockstader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Excell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy LaFave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Wixom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomas Dansie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Cope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Masefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Haraden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Mailoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snow Jensen & Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Wolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?