Maguire v. Patterson

Plaintiff: Brian E. Maguire
Defendant: Thomas E. Patterson
Case Number: 2:2010cv00626
Filed: July 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 211 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 6/28/2018. (las)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment-granting in part and denying in part 175 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 12/14/15. (jmr)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM DECISION and THIRD ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS, ANSWER AND/OR DISPOSITIVE MOTION. The USMS Shall serve a completed summons, a copy of the Amended Complaint and a copy of this Order upon the above listed defendants. W ithin 20 days of being served, Defendants must file an answer or motion to dismiss and proposed order, as outlined above. If filing a Martinez report, Plaintiff may file a response within thirty days of the report's filing date. If served with a summary judgment motion or motion to dismiss, Plaintiff must submit a response within 30 days of the motion's filing date. If requesting relief otherwise contemplated under the procedural rules, Defendants must do so within 90 days of filing their answer. Denying 108 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting 132 Plaintiffs motion to waive summary judgment time limits for his evidence already. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/18/2014. (kpf)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM DECISION & Second Order Directing Service of Process, Answer And/Or Dispositive Motion granting 70 Motion to Seal; granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 7/25/12. (jmr)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS, ANSWER AND/ORDISPOSITIVE MOTION-denying 44 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 23 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 34 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 7/26/11. (jmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maguire v. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian E. Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?