Barrett v. Salt Lake County et al

Plaintiff: Michael Barrett
Defendant: Salt Lake County and Linda Hamilton
Case Number: 2:2010cv00792
Filed: August 13, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Equitable Relief. See order for details. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 8/28/13. (jlw)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 80 Motion for Equitable Relief. The precise nature and amount of the equitable relief will be determined at an evidentiary hearing that will soon be set by the court. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 4/29/13. (jlw)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 71 Motion for New Trial; denying 71 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 4/29/13. (jlw)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs First and Second Causes of Action are DISMISSED, but his Sixth Cause of Action for Retaliation pursuant to Title VII remains. Within the next week, the court will set a new trial date and will issue a Trial Order, setting forth the deadlines for filings related to trial. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 06/04/2012. (asp)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/29/11 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett v. Salt Lake County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Barrett
Represented By: Russell T. Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?