Commonwealth Property Advocates v. Citimortgage et al
Plaintiff: Commonwealth Property Advocates
Defendant: Citimortgage, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 2:2010cv00885
Filed: September 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 21 Motion to Reconsider. Plaintiffs counsel is sanctioned and hereby ordered to pay Defendants costs related to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand and Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider. The court emphasizes that these costs are t o be paid by counsel and not his client. Defendants are to submit an affidavit supporting the amount of fee and costs to be awarded. Plaintiffs motion to reconsider is DENIED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/16/2011. (jtj)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Defendants are ordered to show cause why this action should not be remanded to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. In the alternative, Defendants may amend their notice of removal. Defendants have until February 1, 2011 to respond. The previous order dismissing the action is vacatedpending resolution of the courts jurisdiction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/25/2011. (jtj) Modified on 1/25/2011 to modify Document Type to Opinion (jtj).
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 9 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting 5 Motion to Dismiss. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Plaintiffs counsel is also hereby ordered to show cause why he should not be sanctioned. Such response shall be in conformity with the instruction given herein. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/12/2011. (jtj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commonwealth Property Advocates v. Citimortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth Property Advocates
Represented By: E. Craig Smay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage
Represented By: Theresa A. Foxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Represented By: Theresa A. Foxley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?