Anderson v. Eaton Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Anderson
Defendant: Eaton Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Honeywell International, Viacom, General Cable, General Electric Company, Okonite Company, The, Schneider Electric USA, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Georgia-Pacific
Case Number: 2:2010cv00905
Filed: September 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 289 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/9/2015. (blh)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 228 Motion to Substitute Party and the 228 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/1/13. (ss)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 200 Motion to Stay ; granting 201 Motion to Strike ; vacating 105 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/13/12. (ss)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 138 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 143 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 155 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 156 Motion for Joinder; denying 157 Motion for Joinder; denying 158 Motion for Joinder; denying 159 Motion for Joinder; denying 160 Motion for Joinder; denying 161 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 163 Motion for Joinder; denying 164 Motion for Joinder; denying 168 Motion for Joinder; denying 169 Motion for Joinder; denying 184 Motion for Joinder; denying 184 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/24/2012. (asp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Eaton Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Anderson
Represented By: Robert G. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Cable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okonite Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?