Braun et al v. Medtronic Sofamor Danek et al

Plaintiff: John T. Braun and Cricket K Braun and John T Braun Family Limited Liability Company, The
Defendant: Medtronic Sofamor Danek and SDGI Holdings
Case Number: 2:2010cv01283
Filed: December 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 716 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 647 Medtronics Motions for a New Trial; denying 648 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law ; granting 657 Dr. Brauns Motion to Limit Scope ; denying 678 Dr. Brauns Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/21/2015. (jds)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 626 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-For the reasons stated, the court concludes that the split-recovery provision in effect at the time of the underlying claim applies to Dr. Brauns punitive damages award. Because the prior statute is unconstitutional, the court directs the Clerk of Court to enter judgment in favor of Dr. Braun in the amount of $37,050,002. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/3/14. (jmr)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 291 Motion to Remove Claimed Privilege Designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/07/2013. (tls)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 284 Expedited Motion to Remove Claimed Privilege Designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/27/13 (alt)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 263 Motion to Reopen Depositions of Troy Drewry and Michael Sherman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 07/23/2013. (tls)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 206 Motion for Ruling on MSD's Redesignation of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 05/01/2013. (tls)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting as to topics 1, 6, 32, 33, 40 and granted in part as to Topics 4, 7, 9, 10, 15, 27, 32, 41-44 118 Motion for Protective Order ; granting as to topics 25, 47, 48 and granted in part as to Topics 4, 7, 9, 10, 12, 15, 27, 32, 41-44 205 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 04/12/2013. (asp)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM DECISION/Ruling and Order granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Compel ; denying 66 Motion to Amend/Correct ; granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion for Protective Order ; granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion to Compel ; granting 116 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 01/02/2013. (asp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun et al v. Medtronic Sofamor Danek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Braun
Represented By: Chad R. Derum
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cricket K Braun and John T Braun Family Limited Liability Company, The
Represented By: Chad R. Derum
Represented By: Brent V. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Sofamor Danek
Represented By: John A. Adams
Represented By: Caleb J. Frischknecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDGI Holdings
Represented By: John A. Adams
Represented By: Caleb J. Frischknecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?