Henry v. Black

Plaintiff: Justin Henry
Defendant: Michael Black
Case Number: 2:2011cv00129
Filed: February 1, 2011
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Sanpete
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 15 Motion to Strike Without Prejudice ; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Sanctions; denying 24 Motion for Sanctions. For details, see Memorandum Decision. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/19/2011. (ce)
October 4, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 45 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; denying 58 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 60 Motion to Strike ; denying 62 Motion in Limine ; the deadline for expert discovery in the Scheduling Order is extended until November 1, 2012 for the sole purpose of deposing the testifying experts designated by the parties ; the hearing set in this matter for October 26, 2012, at 8:30 a.m., is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/04/2012. (asp)
February 4, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 4 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/4/2011. (las)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Henry
Represented By: Loren M. Lambert
Represented By: David S. Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Black
Represented By: Lynn S. Davies
Represented By: Michael J. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.