Utah Coalition of La Raza et al v. Herbert et al Featured Case

Lawsuit challenging the constitutionality of Utah's immigration law, HB 497.

Plaintiff: Utah Coalition of La Raza, Service Employees International Union, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board, Centro Civico Mexicano, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Eliana Larios and Alicia Cervantes
Defendant: Gary R. Herbert and Mark Shurtleff
Movant: Asian American Justice Center, Government of Argentina, Government of Brazil, Government of Chile, Government of Columbia, Government of Costa Rica, Government of Ecuador, Government of El Salvador, Government of Guatemala, Government of Honduras, Government of Nicaragua, Government of Paraguay, Government of Peru and Government of Uruguay
Intervenor: Immigration Equality
Amicus: United Mexican States
Case Number: 2:2011cv00401
Filed: May 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 70 Motion for Joinder re: Amicus Curiae Brief of the United Mexican States. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/7/2011. (jtj)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 67 Motion to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/7/2011. (jtj)
June 7, 2011 Filing 74 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher R. Clark and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1367040, filed by Movants Government of Argentina, Government of Brazil, Government of Chile, Government of Columbia, Government of Costa Rica, Government of Ecuador, Government of El Salvador, Government of Guatemala, Government of Honduras, Government of Nicaragua, Government of Paraguay, Government of Peru, Government of Uruguay, United Mexican States. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Lon)
June 7, 2011 Filing 73 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Carla Gorniak and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1367033, filed by Movants Government of Argentina, Government of Brazil, Government of Chile, Government of Columbia, Government of Costa Rica, Government of Ecuador, Government of El Salvador, Government of Guatemala, Government of Honduras, Government of Nicaragua, Government of Paraguay, Government of Peru, Government of Uruguay, United Mexican States. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Lon)
June 7, 2011 Filing 72 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Henry L. Solano and Consent of Local Counsel, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1367017, filed by Movants Government of Argentina, Government of Brazil, Government of Chile, Government of Columbia, Government of Costa Rica, Government of Ecuador, Government of El Salvador, Government of Guatemala, Government of Honduras, Government of Nicaragua, Government of Paraguay, Government of Peru, Government of Uruguay, United Mexican States. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Lon)
June 7, 2011 Filing 71 Plaintiff's MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth Sugarman, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 253IFF8E, filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Motion for Admisison Pro Hac Vice, Ken Sugarman)(Goddard, Darcy)
June 7, 2011 Filing 70 MOTION for Joinder in Brief of United Mexican States as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs filed by Movants Government of Argentina, Government of Brazil, Government of Chile, Government of Columbia, Government of Costa Rica, Government of Ecuador, Government of El Salvador, Government of Guatemala, Government of Honduras, Government of Nicaragua, Government of Paraguay, Government of Peru, Government of Uruguay. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Lon)
June 7, 2011 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Lon A. Jenkins on behalf of Government of Argentina, Government of Brazil, Government of Chile, Government of Columbia, Government of Costa Rica, Government of Ecuador, Government of El Salvador, Government of Guatemala, Government of Honduras, Government of Nicaragua, Government of Paraguay, Government of Peru, Government of Uruguay (Jenkins, Lon)
June 7, 2011 Filing 68 Amicus BRIEF re 67 MOTION to File Amicus Brief by United Mexican States in Support of Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Movant United Mexican States. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Cases, # 2 Appendix Authorities Part 1, # 3 Appendix Authorities Part 2)(Jenkins, Lon)
June 7, 2011 Filing 67 MOTION to File Amicus Brief by United Mexican States filed by Movant United Mexican States. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jenkins, Lon)
June 7, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Lon A. Jenkins on behalf of United Mexican States (Jenkins, Lon)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants hereby are granted an additional 30 days to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/2/2011. (jtj)
June 1, 2011 Filing 64 Amicus Curiae BRIEF in Support re 36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Movant Asian American Justice Center. (asp)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 06/01/2011. (asp)
June 1, 2011 Filing 62 Amicus Curiae BRIEF In Support of the Plaintiffs filed by Intervenor Immigration Equality. (asp)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 06/01/2011. (asp)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 06/01/2011. (asp)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 55 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan E. Schoenfeld for Immigration Equality. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 06/01/2011. (asp)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 49 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah Kathleen Shaholli,Katherine J. Santon for Asian American Justice Center. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov; granting 50 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah Kathleen Shaholli,Katherine J. Santon for Asian American Justice Center. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 05/31/2011. (asp)
June 1, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Motion to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff. (Jensen, Jerrold)
May 31, 2011 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum of Amicus Curiae Immigration Equality in Support of Plaintiffs filed by Movant Immigration Equality. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" Brief Amicus Curiae of Immigration Equality in Support of Plaintiffs, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnard, Brian)
May 31, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan E. Schoenfeld, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1361833, filed by Movant Immigration Equality. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit "B" Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnard, Brian)
May 31, 2011 Filing 54 MOTION to Intervene as Amicus Curiae filed by Movant Immigration Equality. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnard, Brian)
May 31, 2011 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Barnard on behalf of Immigration Equality (Barnard, Brian)
May 27, 2011 Filing 52 NOTICE of LODGED PROPOSED AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Asian American Justice Center re 51 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Marsden, Milo)
May 27, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Movant Asian American Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, Milo)
May 27, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah K. Shaholli, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1360802, filed by Movant Asian American Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, Milo)
May 27, 2011 Filing 49 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine J. Santon, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1360792, filed by Movant Asian American Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsden, Milo)
May 27, 2011 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Milo Steven Marsden on behalf of Asian American Justice Center (Marsden, Milo)
May 24, 2011 Filing 46 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on May 10, 2011 before Judge CLARK WADDOUPS. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kellie Peterson, RPR, Telephone number 801-983-2180. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy and forms are located on the court's website at www.utd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/14/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2011. (jmr)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion for TRO. HB 497 is stayed pending further order of this court. Responses due by 6/8/2011, Replies due by 6/22/2011. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2011 08:30 AM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/11/2011. (jtj)
May 10, 2011 Filing 44 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order per Minute Entry 43 filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (jtj)
May 10, 2011 Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clark Waddoups: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2011 re 36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Alicia Cervantes, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Service Employees International Union, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board, Centro Civico Mexicano, Eliana Larios, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The court advises all present that no recordings are to be taken. Ms. Goddard updates the court as to the status of the parties negotiations on a stay of enforcement of HB 497. Plaintiffs move for a TRO. The court hears argument from the parties. The motion for TRO is GRANTED for the reasons stated on the record. HB 497 is stayed pending further order of this court. The court will prepare a written ruling. Briefing schedule discussed. Responses due by 6/8/2011, Replies due by 6/22/2011. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2011 08:30 AM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. The schedule may be adjusted if more time is needed. The court does not impose a bond for the reasons stated. All parties named as defendants and anyone who is obligated to follow the defendants' instructions are bound by the order until further ruling. Attorney for Plaintiff: Jerrold Jensen, Thomas Roberts, Attorney for Defendant: Darcy Goddard, Cecelia Wang, Andrew Segura, Esperanza Granados, Karen Tumlin, Linton Joaquin, Melissa Keaney (by phone), Shiu-ming Cheer (by phone). Court Reporter: Kelly Peterson. (jwt)
May 10, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE of Hearing by Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board (Goddard, Darcy)
May 9, 2011 Filing 41 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re 36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - at the hearing scheduled for 5/10/2011 counsel should be prepared to update the status of the case and set briefing schedule for the motion. (jwt)
May 9, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: 36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (Notice generated by jwt) Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2011 02:00 PM in Room 102 before Judge Clark Waddoups. (jwt)
May 9, 2011 Filing 39 Case Reassigned to District Judge per Order 38 of Magistrate Judge. Case randomly assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Magistrate Judge Brooke Wells is no longer assigned to this case. (jmr)
May 9, 2011 Judge Clark Waddoups added. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to case. (jmr)
May 9, 2011 Filing 38 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to court policy, Plaintiff's filing of a motion for immediate injunctive relief renders this case ineligible for consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge. Accordingly, the court orders that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment. Signed by Magistrate Brooke C. Wells on 05/09/2011. (docket text order, no attached document). (amn)
May 6, 2011 Filing 37 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Support re 36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Attachments: # 1 Order granting leave to file over length memorandum, # 2 Index of exhibits in support of Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (HB 497), # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 (Archuleta Decl.), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 (Medina Decl.), # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Gerkin Decl.), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 (Cordova Decl.), # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 (Picardi Decl.), # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 (Ruiz Decl.), # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 (Cervantes Decl.), # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 9 (Larios Decl.), # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 (Gascon Decl.), # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 (Gonzalez Decl.), # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 12 (Burbank Decl.), # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 13 (Venegas Decl.), # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 14 (Arguetta Decl.), # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 15 (Lowenthal Decl. & Ex A), # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 16 (Miller Decl. & Exs A-B), # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 17 (Fernandez Decl. & Exs A-G), # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 18 (Fernandez Decl., Exs H-K), # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 19 (Fernandez Decl., Exs L-O))(Goddard, Darcy)
May 6, 2011 Filing 36 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goddard, Darcy)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bradley Phillips for Centro Civico Mexicano,Bradley Phillips for Alicia Cervantes,Bradley Phillips for Coalition of Utah Progressives,Bradley Phillips for Eliana Larios,Bradley Phillips for Latin American Chamber of Commerce,Bradley Phillips for Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez,Bradley Phillips for Salt Lake City Brown Berets,Bradley Phillips for Service Employees International Union,Bradley Phillips for Utah Coalition of La Raza,Bradley Phillips for Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/5/11. (jmr)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melissa S. Keaney for Centro Civico Mexicano,Melissa S. Keaney for Alicia Cervantes,Melissa S. Keaney for Coalition of Utah Progressives,Melissa S. Keaney for Eliana Larios,Melissa S. Keaney for Latin American Chamber of Commerce,Melissa S. Keaney for Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez,Melissa S. Keaney for Salt Lake City Brown Berets,Melissa S. Keaney for Service Employees International Union,Melissa S. Keaney for Utah Coalition of La Raza,Melissa S. Keaney for Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/5/11. (jmr)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shiu-Ming Cheer for Centro Civico Mexicano,Shiu-Ming Cheer for Alicia Cervantes,Shiu-Ming Cheer for Coalition of Utah Progressives,Shiu-Ming Cheer for Eliana Larios,Shiu-Ming Cheer for Latin American Chamber of Commerce,Shiu-Ming Cheer for Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez,Shiu-Ming Cheer for Salt Lake City Brown Berets,Shiu-Ming Cheer for Service Employees International Union,Shiu-Ming Cheer for Utah Coalition of La Raza,Shiu-Ming Cheer for Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/5/11. (jmr)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen Tumlin for Centro Civico Mexicano,Karen Tumlin for Alicia Cervantes,Karen Tumlin for Coalition of Utah Progressives,Karen Tumlin for Eliana Larios,Karen Tumlin for Latin American Chamber of Commerce,Karen Tumlin for Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez,Karen Tumlin for Salt Lake City Brown Berets,Karen Tumlin for Service Employees International Union,Karen Tumlin for Utah Coalition of La Raza,Karen Tumlin for Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/5/11. (jmr)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Linton Joaquin for Centro Civico Mexicano,Linton Joaquin for Alicia Cervantes,Linton Joaquin for Coalition of Utah Progressives,Linton Joaquin for Eliana Larios,Linton Joaquin for Latin American Chamber of Commerce,Linton Joaquin for Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez,Linton Joaquin for Salt Lake City Brown Berets,Linton Joaquin for Service Employees International Union,Linton Joaquin for Utah Coalition of La Raza,Linton Joaquin for Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/5/11. (jmr)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cecillia Wang for Centro Civico Mexicano,Cecillia Wang for Alicia Cervantes,Cecillia Wang for Coalition of Utah Progressives,Cecillia Wang for Eliana Larios,Cecillia Wang for Latin American Chamber of Commerce,Cecillia Wang for Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez,Cecillia Wang for Salt Lake City Brown Berets,Cecillia Wang for Service Employees International Union. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/5/11. (jmr)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andre Segura for Centro Civico Mexicano,Andre Segura for Alicia Cervantes,Andre Segura for Coalition of Utah Progressives,Andre Segura for Eliana Larios,Andre Segura for Latin American Chamber of Commerce,Andre Segura for Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez,Andre Segura for Salt Lake City Brown Berets,Andre Segura for Service Employees International Union,Andre Segura for Utah Coalition of La Raza,Andre Segura for Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/5/11. (jmr)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elora Mukherjee for Centro Civico Mexicano,Elora Mukherjee for Alicia Cervantes,Elora Mukherjee for Coalition of Utah Progressives,Elora Mukherjee for Eliana Larios,Elora Mukherjee for Latin American Chamber of Commerce,Elora Mukherjee for Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez,Elora Mukherjee for Salt Lake City Brown Berets,Elora Mukherjee for Service Employees International Union,Elora Mukherjee for Utah Coalition of La Raza,Elora Mukherjee for Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/5/11. (jmr)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Omar Jadwat for Centro Civico Mexicano,Omar Jadwat for Alicia Cervantes,Omar Jadwat for Coalition of Utah Progressives,Omar Jadwat for Eliana Larios,Omar Jadwat for Latin American Chamber of Commerce,Omar Jadwat for Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez,Omar Jadwat for Salt Lake City Brown Berets,Omar Jadwat for Service Employees International Union,Omar Jadwat for Utah Coalition of La Raza,Omar Jadwat for Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/5/11. (jmr)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine Desormeau for Centro Civico Mexicano,Katherine Desormeau for Alicia Cervantes,Katherine Desormeau for Coalition of Utah Progressives,Katherine Desormeau for Eliana Larios,Katherine Desormeau for Latin American Chamber of Commerce,Katherine Desormeau for Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez,Katherine Desormeau for Salt Lake City Brown Berets,Katherine Desormeau for Service Employees International Union,Katherine Desormeau for Utah Coalition of La Raza,Katherine Desormeau for Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/4/11. (jmr)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OVER LENGTH MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION- granting 18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Memorandum shall be no more than 40 pages long. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/5/11. (jmr)
May 5, 2011 Filing 24 MOTION to Seal Document Declarations of Doe Plaintiffs (Jane Doe #1, John Doe #1, and John Doe #2) filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goddard, Darcy)
May 5, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas D. Roberts on behalf of Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff (Roberts, Thomas)
May 5, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerrold S. Jensen on behalf of Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff (Jensen, Jerrold)
May 5, 2011 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board re 19 MOTION for Leave for Doe Plaintiffs to Proceed Under Pseudonyms, 20 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Goddard, Darcy)
May 4, 2011 Filing 20 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Support re 19 MOTION for Leave for Doe Plaintiffs to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Octavio Villalpando, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Theresa Martinez, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Darcy M. Goddard, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Goddard, Darcy)
May 4, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave for Doe Plaintiffs to Proceed Under Pseudonyms filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Goddard, Darcy)
May 4, 2011 Filing 18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bradley S. Phillips, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1345029, filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melissa S. Keaney, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1345028, filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shiu Ming Cheer, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1345027, filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen C. Tumlin, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1345026, filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Linton Joaquin, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1345025, filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cecillia Wang, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1345000, filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andre Segura, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1344998, filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elora Mukherjee, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1344977, filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Omar C. Jadwat, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1344970, filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Katherine Desormeau, Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-1344965, filed by Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board. (Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Bradley S. Phillips (tls)
May 3, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Cecillia D. Wang and Katherine Desormeau (tls)
May 3, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Omar C. Jadwat, Andre Segura and Elora Mukherjee (tls)
May 3, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Linton Joaquin, Karen Tumlin and Shiu-Ming Cheer (tls)
May 3, 2011 Filing 3 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(jlw)
May 3, 2011 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 1088-1344257), filed by Eliana Larios, Alicia Cervantes, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Centro Civico Mexicano, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Salt Lake City Brown Berets. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Goddard, Darcy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiffs Centro Civico Mexicano, Alicia Cervantes, Coalition of Utah Progressives, Eliana Larios, Latin American Chamber of Commerce, Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez, Salt Lake City Brown Berets, Service Employees International Union, Utah Coalition of La Raza, Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 350.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utah Coalition of La Raza et al v. Herbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utah Coalition of La Raza
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Represented By: Esperanza Granados
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Represented By: Esperanza Granados
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Workers United Rocky Mountain Joint Board
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Represented By: Esperanza Granados
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centro Civico Mexicano
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Represented By: Esperanza Granados
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition of Utah Progressives
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Represented By: Esperanza Granados
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latin American Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Represented By: Esperanza Granados
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salt Lake City Brown Berets
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Represented By: Esperanza Granados
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Ivan Salazar-Gomez
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Represented By: Esperanza Granados
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliana Larios
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Represented By: Esperanza Granados
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Cervantes
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Katherine Desormeau
Represented By: Darcy M. Goddard
Represented By: Esperanza Granados
Represented By: Omar Jadwat
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Elora Mukherjee
Represented By: Bradley Stuart Phillips
Represented By: Andre Segura
Represented By: Kenneth John Sugarman
Represented By: Karen C. Tumlin
Represented By: Cecillia Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Herbert
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Represented By: Thomas D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Shurtleff
Represented By: Jerrold S. Jensen
Represented By: Thomas D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Asian American Justice Center
Represented By: Milo Steven Marsden
Represented By: Katherine J. Santon
Represented By: Sarah Kathleen Shaholli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Argentina
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Brazil
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Chile
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Columbia
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Costa Rica
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Ecuador
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of El Salvador
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Guatemala
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Honduras
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Nicaragua
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Paraguay
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Peru
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Government of Uruguay
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Immigration Equality
Represented By: Brian M. Barnard
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United Mexican States
Represented By: Christopher R. Clark
Represented By: Carla Gorniak
Represented By: Lon A. Jenkins
Represented By: Henry L. Solano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?