Wakefield Kennedy v. Baldwin et al
Plaintiff: Wakefield Kennedy
Defendant: D. Shane Baldwin, Jane Doe Baldwin and Metro National Settlement Services
Case Number: 2:2011cv00604
Filed: June 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 294 Motion for Certificate of Appealability: the 277 Judgment entered 3/7/14, is final and appealable. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/15/14 (alt)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 291 Motion for Summary Judgment on Wakefield Kennedy's 5th cause of action: judgment shall be entered against Metro National Settlement Services and in favor of Wakefield in the amount of $1,190,132.50, with an award of prejudgment interest on that amount at the federal rate from 1/1/11 until paid. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/28/14 (alt)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 273 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/25/14 (alt)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 193 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 210 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: no sooner than 14 days after entry of judgment as to State Capital Holdings, Clerk of the Court is to release the Woodland Mall Loan Documents to State Capital Holdings. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/6/14 (alt)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 121 Second Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/11/14 (alt)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 143 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against Silverleaf Financial 9 and D. Shane Baldwin. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/6/13 (alt)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Compel; denying 98 Motion for Sanctions - see order for specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/16/12. (alp)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 67 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/23/12 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wakefield Kennedy v. Baldwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wakefield Kennedy
Represented By: John Ray Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Shane Baldwin
Represented By: Casey W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro National Settlement Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?