Brown et al v. Herbert et al
Plaintiff: Kody Brown, Meri Brown, Janelle Brown, Christine Brown and Robyn Sullivan
Defendant: Gary R. Herbert, Mark Shurtleff and Jeffrey R. Buhman
Case Number: 2:2011cv00652
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND JUDGMENT-The court therefore finds in favor of Plaintiffs on their seventh and final count in the Complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983 and GRANTS summary judgment in their favor on this last remaining count. Case Closed. See Memorandum Decision for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/27/14. (jmr)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part 49 Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 55 Motion for Summary Judgment ; finding as moot 60 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 12/13/13. See order for details(rks)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-denying 46 Motion to Dismiss-For the reasons stated in the Order, the court hereby DENIES Defendant Buhmans motion to dismiss on the grounds of mootness. (Dkt. No. 46). On July 2, 2012, the court issue d a stay on further proceedings on Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment and Defendants cross-motion for summary judgment. (Dkt. No. 64). The stay is now LIFTED. Plaintiffs may, in their discretion, file a reply memorandum to Defendants memorandum o pposing Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment on or before August 31, 2012. Plaintiffs should also file a memorandum opposing Defendants cross-motion for summary judgment on or before September 14, 2012. Defendant may then, at his discretion, file a reply memorandum on or before September 28, 2012. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 8/17/12. (jmr)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants motion as to Defendants Gary R. Herbert, in his official capacity as Governor of Utah, and Mark Shurtleff, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Utah, is GRANTED. These Defendants are dismissed. Defendants motion with regard to Jeffrey R. Buhman, in his official capacity as County Attorney for Utah County, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/3/12. (jmr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Herbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kody Brown
Represented By: Adam Alba
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meri Brown
Represented By: Adam Alba
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janelle Brown
Represented By: Adam Alba
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Brown
Represented By: Adam Alba
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Sullivan
Represented By: Adam Alba
Represented By: Jonathan Turley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Shurtleff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Buhman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?