Dutcher et al v. Matheson et al

Plaintiff: Richard Dutcher, Gwen Dutcher, Richard Ferguson, Michelle Ferguson and Catherine Richards Ahlers
Defendant: Stuart T. Matheson, Matheson, Mortensen, Olsen & Jeppson, ReconTrust, BAC Home Loans Servicing and Bank of America
Case Number: 2:2011cv00666
Filed: July 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 105 Motion to Intervene; denying 107 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting 112 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/3/2014. (blh)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 97 Defendant ReconTrusts Motion Transfer. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/25/14. (ss)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants may file a reply to Plaintiffs supplemental brief of no more than ten (10) pages within fourteen (14) days of this Order. denying 90 Motion to Strike ; denying 91 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/9/13. (ss)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 51 Motion to Intervene; denying 54 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 54 Motion to Set Aside Judgment; denying 56 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 07/23/2012. (tls)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying as moot 25 Motion for TRO; denying as moot 25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 28 Motion to Certify Class; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 20 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/8/2012. (tls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dutcher et al v. Matheson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dutcher
Represented By: Ryan R. West
Represented By: Tyson B. Snow
Represented By: Marcus R. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Dutcher
Represented By: Ryan R. West
Represented By: Tyson B. Snow
Represented By: Marcus R. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ferguson
Represented By: Ryan R. West
Represented By: Tyson B. Snow
Represented By: Marcus R. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Ferguson
Represented By: Marcus R. Mumford
Represented By: Tyson B. Snow
Represented By: Ryan R. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Richards Ahlers
Represented By: Marcus R. Mumford
Represented By: Tyson B. Snow
Represented By: Ryan R. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart T. Matheson
Represented By: Peter W. Billings
Represented By: Philip D. Dracht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matheson, Mortensen, Olsen & Jeppson
Represented By: Peter W. Billings
Represented By: Philip D. Dracht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust
Represented By: Peter W. Billings
Represented By: Philip D. Dracht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing
Represented By: Peter W. Billings
Represented By: Philip D. Dracht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Peter W. Billings
Represented By: Philip D. Dracht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?