State of Utah et al v. United States of America Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: State of Utah and Garfield County
Defendant: United States of America Department of the Interior and United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 2:2011cv01045
Filed: November 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Samuel Alba
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:2409
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER-granting 287 Motion to Quash; denying 290 Motion to Strike. It authorizes SUWA to file a subpoena tailored to the fifteen roads now at issue in the bellwether trial. If SUWA issues such a subpoena and the State believes some documents are protected by a privilege, the State may raise such objections at that time. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/9/18. (jmr)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Certification of Issue to State Supreme Court. For the foregoing reasons, the court hereby ORDERS that, pursuant to Rule 41 of the Utah Rules of Appellate Procedure, the following question is certified to the Utah Supreme Court:Ar e Utah Code § 78B-2-201(1) and its predecessor statutes of limitations or statutes of repose? It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court shall transmit a copy of this certification to the parties and shall submit to the Utah Supreme Court a certified copy of this certification. Should the Utah Supreme Court determine that all or any portion of the record be filed with the Court, this court further orders the Clerk shall transmit the requested records. Signed by Judges David Nuffer, Clark Waddoups, Robert J. Shelby on 4/17/2015. (jwt)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Intervene; granting 95 Motion for Leave to File supplemental exhibit. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/12/13 (alt)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 43 Motion for Consolidated Case Management Order ; lifting stay of case ; transferring case to Judge Clark Waddoups. See order for details. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 03/12/2013. (asp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Utah et al v. United States of America Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Utah
Represented By: Kathy A. F. Davis
Represented By: Christopher A. Lacombe
Represented By: Harry H. Souvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garfield County
Represented By: Kathy A. F. Davis
Represented By: Christopher A. Lacombe
Represented By: Harry H. Souvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?