Klein v. Cornelius et al

Plaintiff: R. Wayne Klein
Defendant: William T. Cornelius and Cornelius & Salhab
Case Number: 2:2011cv01159
Filed: December 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:0754
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order denying 45 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 1/27/14. (jlw)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Receiver and against Defendants in the amount of $89,845.73 plus applicable costs, fees, and interest. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 11/13/13. (jlw)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 11 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; denying 11 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 06/15/2012. (asp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klein v. Cornelius et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Wayne Klein
Represented By: David C. Castleberry
Represented By: Aaron C. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Cornelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelius & Salhab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?