Matthew S Simpson v. A Washington-Adduci
Petitioner: Matthew Scott Simpson
Respondent: A Washington-Adduci
Case Number: 2:2012cv00204
Filed: February 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM DECISION dismissing 21 Petitioner's Motion Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/17/12. (ss)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 1 2255 Motion. However, the Court will enter an Amended Judgment reflecting the Courts recommendation that Petitioner be allowed to participate in the RDAP program. It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 8(a) of the Rules Governing § 2255 Cases, an evidentiary hearing is not required. It is further ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing § 2255 Cases, the Court DENIES Petitioner a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/09/2012. (asp)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Notifying Petitioner his "Petition for Sentence Credit and Clarification of Facts of Prior Court's Recommendation to Enroll in RDAP" will be Construed as a Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255, if not Withdrawn; Setting Response Time; and Ordering Mailing of Information. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/22/2012. (tls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew S Simpson v. A Washington-Adduci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Scott Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A Washington-Adduci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?