Soto v. State of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Jose Soto
Defendant: Dennis Sorensen, Central Utah Correctional Facility and State of Utah
Case Number: 2:2012cv00668
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Sanpete
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting defendants Motion for Summary Judgment because of Plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Granting 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/20/2014. (kpf)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER: denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel. It is further ordered that, within thirty days, Plaintiff shall respond to Defendants summary judgment motion. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/8/2013. (kpf)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order to Amend Deficient Complaint and MEMORANDUM DECISION. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/23/2012. (tls)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. State of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Utah Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?