Estate of Austin D. Herrick v. USA

Plaintiff: Estate of Austin D. Herrick
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2012cv00671
Filed: July 6, 2012
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 39 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 5/19/2016. (eat)
March 31, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 37 Motion for Clarification and Amending 35 the Court's March 25, 2016 Memorandum Decision and Order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/31/2016. (eat)
March 25, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and order granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/25/16. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Austin D. Herrick v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Austin D. Herrick
Represented By: Paul W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?