Schoepf et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf and Bear River Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv00731
Filed: July 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendant's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Spoliation Sanctions is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED in its entirety. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 5/23/2017. (blh)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER finding as moot #80 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill; finding as moot #81 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris; granting #86 Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Spoliation Sanctions. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 5/22/2017. (blh)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl present. After arguments were heard and discussion held, Court took under advisement #80 Motion to Exclude; #81 Motion to Exclude; #86 Motion for Sanctions, Motion Hearing held on 3/20/2017. Written Order to follow oral order: Yes.Attorney for Plaintiff: Eric Olsen and Sarah Marie Wade, Attorney for Defendant Clay A. Guise, Tracy H. Fowler and Paul W. Shakespear.Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Olson on behalf of Bear River Mutual Insurance Company (Olson, Eric)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ***AMENDED*** NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill and Memorandum in Support , #86 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Renewed) for Spoliation, #81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2017 at 11:00 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill and Memorandum in Support , #81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2017 at 11:00 AM in Rm 8.300 before Judge Dee Benson. (reb)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill and Memorandum in Support , #81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Shakespear, Paul)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 REPLY to Response to Motion re #81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 3-30-16 Deposition of Mark Hoffman, #3 Exhibit 2 - Norris Expert Report, #4 Exhibit 3 - Norris Depo Excerpts)(Shakespear, Paul)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REPLY to Response to Motion re #80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 3-30-16 Deposition of Mark Hoffman, #3 Exhibit 2 - 7-21-16 Deposition of Mark Hoffman, #4 Exhibit 3 - NHTSA's August 2006 Closing Report, #5 Exhibit 4 - Deposition of Morrill, #6 Exhibit 5 - 7-15-16 Deposition of Shukri Souri)(Shakespear, Paul)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Deadlines/Hearings terminated. The Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 12/19/2016 has been cancelled as well as the Jury Trial scheduled for 1/9/2017. SEE ORDER #108. Counsel to contact the Court to set new dates. (reb)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill, #81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris. Replies due by 12/19/2016. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 12/5/2016. (blh)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill and Memorandum in Support , #81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandums)(Shakespear, Paul)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Renewed) for Spoliation filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, Bear River Mutual Ins. v. Intermountain Claims, Inc. et al.)(Shakespear, Paul)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #105 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Trial Date and All Pretrial Deadlines. Counsel should contact the Court to set new pretrial deadlines and a new trial date. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/28/2016. (blh)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #86 MOTION for Sanctions (Renewed) for Spoliation. Replies due by 12/2/2016. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/28/2016. (blh)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Memorandum) (Shakespear, Paul) Modified by changing event type to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on 11/28/2016 (blh).
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting Motion for Continuance of Trial Date)(Cutt, David)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Cutt, David)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Cutt, David)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Marie Wade on behalf of Bear River Mutual Insurance Company (Wade, Sarah)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time To File Oppositions to Motions filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutt, David) Modified by changing event type to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on 11/14/2016 (blh).
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #99 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill, #81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris. Responses due by 11/9/2016. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/7/2016. (blh)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill and Memorandum in Support , #81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cutt, David)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #86 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Renewed) for Spoliation filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibits B)(Cutt, David)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Cutt on behalf of Bear River Mutual Insurance Company (Cutt, David)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Jordan P. Kendell filed by Jordan P. Kendell on behalf of Bear River Mutual Insurance Company (Kendell, Jordan)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill, #81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris, #86 MOTION for Sanctions (Renewed) for Spoliation. Responses due by 11/4/2016. Additionally, the deadline for filings motions in limine is extended to 11/11/2016. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/1/2016. (blh)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill and Memorandum in Support , #86 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Renewed) for Spoliation, #81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Oppositions to Motions)(Shakespear, Paul)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan P. Kendell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kendell, Jordan)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Jeff M. Sbaih filed by Jeff M. Sbaih on behalf of Bear River Mutual Insurance Company (Sbaih, Jeff)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re #74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Defect Claims filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 2)(Sbaih, Jeff)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Paul W. Shakespear in Support re #76 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Shakespear, Paul)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPLY to Response to Motion re #76 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Shakespear, Paul)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Ford's Allocation of Fault filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Sbaih, Jeff)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ford's Affirmative Defenses on Damages filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Sbaih, Jeff)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Renewed) for Spoliation filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Order on Defendants Motion for Spoliation Sanctions, #3 Exhibit 2 - Norris Dep. Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 3 - Letter from IC Specialty Services to MorrFire Investigations, dated September 7, 2011, #5 Exhibit 4 - Letter from Jeffery T. Morrill to Marcy Johnson at Bear River, Sept. 20, 2011, #6 Exhibit 5 - Evidence Transmittal Letter, #7 Exhibit 6 - Colwell Dep. Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 7 - Morrill Dep. Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 8 - Shukri Souri Dep. Excerpts)(Shakespear, Paul)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #75 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ford's Affirmative Defenses on Damages filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dep. of Julie Schoepf)(Shakespear, Paul)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE to Motion re #76 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-11, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 12-23)(Sbaih, Jeff)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Defect Claims filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 7/21/16 Deposition of Mark Hoffman, #3 Exhibit 2 - Supplemental Declaration of Mark Hoffman, #4 Exhibit 3 - 3/30/16 Deposition of Mark Hoffman, #5 Exhibit 4 - Morrill Dep., #6 Exhibit 5 - Richardson Dep., #7 Exhibit 6 - Dep. of Shukri Souri)(Shakespear, Paul)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #73 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Ford's Allocation of Fault filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - 7/20/16 Deposition of Mark Hoffman, #3 Exhibit 2 - 3/30/16 Deposition of Mark Hoffman, #4 Exhibit 3 - FSA History, #5 Exhibit 4 - Nov. 28, 2012 Email from P. Shakespear to B. Gilchrist, #6 Exhibit 5 - Jan. 23, 2013 Claim Note, #7 Exhibit 6 - Fords Discovery Responses, #8 Exhibit 7 - Jeff Schoepf Dep., #9 Exhibit 8 - Julie Schoepf Dep.)(Shakespear, Paul)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Tad Norris and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Colwell Rpt, #3 Exhibit 2 - Norris Depo, #4 Exhibit 3 - Colwell Depo, #5 Exhibit 4 - Morrill Depo, #6 Exhibit 5 - Complaint)(Shakespear, Paul)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Opinions of Jeff Morrill and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Norris Depo, #2 Exhibit B - Morrill Depo, #3 Exhibit C - Morrill Report)(Shakespear, Paul)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #78 Motion to Establish Deadlines for Daubert Motions and Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/22/2016. (blh)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Stipulated MOTION Establishing Deadlines for Daubert Motions and Motions in Limine and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion Establishing Deadlines for Daubert Motions and Motions in Limine)(Shakespear, Paul)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Intent to Issue Subpoena Duces Tecum by Bear River Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit subpoena Duces Tecum) (Sbaih, Jeff)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Hoffman Depo, #2 Exhibit Ex B Decl of Hoffman 2014 0123, #3 Exhibit Ex C Supp Decl of Hoffman, #4 Exhibit Ex D Hoffman 30b6 Depo, #5 Exhibit Ex E Richardson Depo, #6 Exhibit Ex F Julie Schoepf Depo, #7 Exhibit Ex G Decl of Hoffman 2016 0805)(Shakespear, Paul)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Ford's Affirmative Defenses on Damages filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Sbaih, Jeff)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Defect Claims filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Sbaih, Jeff)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Ford's Allocation of Fault filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Sbaih, Jeff)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time To File Dispositive Motions. Motions due by 8/5/2016. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/1/2016. (blh)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time To File Dispositive Motions filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sbaih, Jeff)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re #53 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Sbaih, Jeff)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike Defendant Ford Motor Company's Notice of Intent to Allowcate Fault filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Sbaih, Jeff)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE OF ERROR re #67 STIPULATION Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Motions. Description of error: A stipulated motion was filed as a "Stipulation" instead of using a Motions event. The clerk has changed the filing event to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (blh)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Motions by Bear River Mutual Insurance Company, Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sbaih, Jeff) Modified by changing event type to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on 7/22/2016 (blh).
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #53 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #55 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike. Replies due by 7/22/2016. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 7/13/2016. (blh)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to file reply to Motions filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sbaih, Jeff) Modified by changing event type to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on 7/13/2016 (blh).
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE-granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time. Expert discovery will close on July 22, 2016. All other deadlines remain as is and unchanged. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/29/16. (jmr)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/22/2016 per Order #64 .(jmr)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time Reply to Motions filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sbaih, Jeff) Modified by changing event type to Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply on 7/6/2016 (blh).
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery Deadlines filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sbaih, Jeff)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #53 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2 - June 19, 2014 Supplemental Declaration of Mark Hoffman, #4 Exhibit 3 - March 30, 2016 Deposition of Mark Hoffman, #5 Exhibit 4 - Order Granting Defendants Motion To Dismiss or for Partial Summary Judgment (Nassir Aryubi, Case No. 10-14228) (February 3, 2012), #6 Exhibit 5 - Transcript from Duncan v. Ford Motor Company)(Shakespear, Paul)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #55 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike Notice of Intent to Allocate Fault filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2 - Nov. 28, 2012 Email from P. Shakespear to B. Gilchrist, #4 Exhibit 3 - Fords Initial Disclosures, #5 Exhibit 4 - Jan. 23, 2013 Claim Note, #6 Exhibit 5 - May 3, 2013 Claim Note, #7 Exhibit 6 - Fords Discovery Responses, #8 Exhibit 7 - Feb. 22, 2016 Dep. Notice, #9 Exhibit 8 - Jeff Schoepf Dep., #10 Exhibit 9 - Julie Schoepf Dep.)(Shakespear, Paul)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting Stipulated #58 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #58 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike , #53 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Responses due by 6/17/2016 Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/15/16. (jmr)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike , #53 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions)(Shakespear, Paul)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #53 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #55 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike. Responses due by 6/13/2016. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 5/27/2016. (blh)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike , #53 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions)(Shakespear, Paul)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #54 Notice of Intent to Allocate Fault filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Sbaih, Jeff) Modified by creating docket entry relationship on 5/13/2016 (blh).
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Allocation of Fault by Ford Motor Company (Shakespear, Paul)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Sbaih, Jeff)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clay A. Guise for Ford Motor Company. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/4/16. (jlw)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Clay A. Guise , Registration fee $ 15, receipt number 1088-2449841, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission PHV, #2 Exhibit B - CM-ECF Form, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for PHV)(Fowler, Tracy)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2016. Expert Discovery due by 7/1/2016. Motions due by 8/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/29/2016. (las)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/10/2016. Counsel present. Court hears statements and set scheduling order. Parties are directed to prepare and submit order to the court at ipt@utd.uscourts.gov. Court adjourned. Attorney for Plaintiff: Jeff M. Sbaih, Attorney for Defendant: Tracy H. Fowler. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: 10:54:15, Time End: 11:15:43, Room 7.400.)(jds)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Scheduling Order (Proposed) filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Sbaih, Jeff)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Notice generated by EJF Chambers) Motion Hearing re #46 REQUEST for Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2016 at 10:30 AM in Rm 7.400 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (lnp)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REQUEST for Scheduling Conference Joint filed by Plaintiff Bear River Mutual Insurance Company. (Sbaih, Jeff)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Fact Discovery due by 3/1/2016. Burden of proof expert reports due 3/15/16. Response expert reports due 5/1/16. All other deadlines in this case remain as is and are unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/8/15. (jlw)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order to Extend Case Deadlines filed by Plaintiffs Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sbaih, Jeff)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Substitute Party. Bear River Mutual Insurance Company added. Jeff R. Schoepf and Julie Schoepf terminated. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 6/10/15. (jlw)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2015. Discovery due by 12/31/2015. Motions due by 8/1/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2016 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Dee Benson. 15 Day Jury Trial set for 1/9/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Dee Benson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/16/15. (jlw)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf. (Sbaih, Jeff)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2015., Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2015., Discovery due by 12/31/2015., Motions due by 8/1/2016., Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2016 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Dee Benson., 15 Day Jury Trial set for 2/1/2016 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Dee Benson.) See order for further details. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 5/18/15. (jlw)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Plaintiff's MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Plaintiffs Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sbaih, Jeff)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sbaih, Jeff)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Discovery due by 8/21/2015. Motions due by 9/1/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2016 at 02:30 PM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Dee Benson. 10 Day Jury Trial set for 2/1/2016 at 08:30 AM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Dee Benson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 5/12/2015. (jds)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sbaih, Jeff)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Deadlines/Hearings terminated. The 9/8/2014 Final Pretrial Conference is VACATED and the 9/22/2014 Jury Trial date is VACATED (reb)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #20 Motion for Spoliation Sanctions. See order for details. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/12/14. (jlw)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Motion for Spoliation Sanctions) (Joint) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Shakespear, Paul)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Motion for Spoliation Sanctions) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Declaration of Mark Hoffman, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Clay Guise)(Shakespear, Paul)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl present. After arguments were heard and discussion held on #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions. Court ruled; Taking under advisement #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions. Written Order to follow oral order: Y. Attorney for Plaintiff: Robert Gilchrist and Jeff Sbaih, Attorney for Defendant Tracy Fowler and Paul Shakespear. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ***AMENDED***NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Motion for Spoliation Sanctions) : (Notice generated by chambers) Motion Hearing RESET FOR THURSDAY 6/5/2014 02:30 PM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Dee Benson. Court Address: NEW COURTHOUSE - 351 South West Temple, Salt Lake City, Utah (reb)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ***AMENDED***NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Motion for Spoliation Sanctions) : (Notice generated by chambers) Motion Hearing RESET FOR FRIDAY 6/6/2014 02:30 PM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Dee Benson. Court Address: NEW COURTHOUSE - 351 South West Temple, Salt Lake City, Utah (reb)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Motion for Spoliation Sanctions) : (Notice generated by chambers) Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2014 02:30 PM in Rm 3.400 before Judge Dee Benson. Court Address: NEW COURTHOUSE - 351 South West Temple, Salt Lake City, Utah (reb)
April 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE FROM THE COURT - The relocation move of the CM/ECF server disrupted some docketing which occurred between 2:20 pm on April 4 (Friday) and 12 midnight on April 4. An entry was made in this case but does not appear on the docket. If you e-filed anything in that period of time, it will be necessary for you to refile as soon as possible. If the event you are docketing allows extra text, please add this text to your docket entry: "Redocketed per request of the Clerk on April 6, 2014" (rks)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Motion for Spoliation Sanctions) (Redocketed per request of the Clerk on April 6, 2014) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Shakespear, Paul) Modified to reflect original file date on 4/7/2014 (rks).
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/24/14. (jlw)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Motion for Spoliation Sanctions) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Bear River Payment Summary, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit C - Dec. 28, 2011 Demolition Permit for 5359 W. Woodland Dr., Highland, UT and Demolition Invoice, #5 Exhibit D - Email from C. Gleed to P. Shakespear, Feb. 12, 2013, #6 Exhibit E - Email from C. Gleed to P. Shakespear, Feb. 22, 2013, #7 Exhibit F - Emails between P. Shakespear and C. Gleed, Feb. 26-28, 2013)(Shakespear, Paul)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Ex-Parte Application for Leave to File an Overlength Reply Memorandum)(Shakespear, Paul)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Motion for Spoliation Sanctions) filed by Plaintiffs Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Tad Norris, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Jeffery T. Morrill, CPA, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Mark Ingersoll, #4 Exhibit Ford Recall)(Sbaih, Jeff)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Stipulated #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #21 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Motion for Spoliation Sanctions) and Memorandum in Support . Responses due by 3/7/2014. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/31/14. (jmr)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Motion for Spoliation Sanctions) and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sbaih, Jeff)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions and Memorandum in Support (Motion for Spoliation Sanctions) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schoepft Statement, #2 Exhibit B - Fire Dept Rpt, #3 Exhibit C - Norris Report, #4 Exhibit D - Morton Notice Letter, #5 Exhibit E - FMC Notice Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Hoffman Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - VINFSADetails Launched, #8 Exhibit H - Owner Notification Letters, #9 Exhibit I - Evidence Transmittal Letter, #10 Exhibit J - MorrFire Report, #11 Exhibit K - Notice of Inspection, #12 Exhibit L - Paul Shakespear Declaration, #13 Exhibit M - Evidence Retention Form, #14 Exhibit N - Tad Norris Resume, #15 Exhibit O - Norris Career Summary, #16 Exhibit P - MorrFire Investigations)(Fowler, Tracy)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Stipulated Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 09/04/2013. (tls)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shakespear, Paul)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 8/13/13. (jlw)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiffs' to Respond to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sbaih, Jeff)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company First Set of Requests for Production of Documents (Shakespear, Paul)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Shakespear, Paul)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeff M. Sbaih on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sbaih, Jeff)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Hearing vacated. Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2013. Discovery due by 3/15/2014. Motions due by 4/15/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2014 02:30 PM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. 10 Day Jury Trial set for 9/22/2014 08:30 AM in Room 246 before Judge Dee Benson. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/7/12. (jlw)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilchrist, Robert)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul W. Shakespear on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Shakespear, Paul)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Notice generated by Theresa Brown)The Attorneys Planning Meeting Report and Proposed Scheduling Order forms, available on the court web site at # http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/formpage.html, should be prepared 21 days before the Initial Pretrial Conference hearing date.NOTICE TO COUNSEL, The Court may enter a scheduling order and vacate the hearing if counsel(a) file a stipulated Attorneys Planning Meeting Report; and(b) e-mail a Proposed Scheduling Order to #ipt@utd.uscourts.gov21 days before the scheduled hearing. See instructions at # http://www.utd.uscourts.gov/documents/ipt.html Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2012 10:30 AM in Room 477 before Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. (tab)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference. (jlw)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Ford Motor Company, Plaintiffs Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf. (jlw)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Ford Motor Company.(Fowler, Tracy)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Ford Motor Company - answer due 10/5/2012. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/28/12. (jlw)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fowler, Tracy)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy H. Fowler on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Fowler, Tracy)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf as to Ford Motor Company served on 8/27/2012, answer due 9/17/2012. (Gilchrist, Robert)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4681052379), filed by Jeff R. Schoepf, Julie Schoepf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (rls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoepf et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff R. Schoepf
Represented By: Jeff M. Sbaih
Represented By: Robert G. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Schoepf
Represented By: Jeff M. Sbaih
Represented By: Robert G. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bear River Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric S. Olson
Represented By: Jeff M. Sbaih
Represented By: Robert G. Gilchrist
Represented By: David A. Cutt
Represented By: Jordan P. Kendell
Represented By: Sarah M. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Clay A. Guise
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Represented By: Paul W. Shakespear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?