Johnsen and Allphin Properties v. First American Title Insurance

Plaintiff: Johnsen and Allphin Properties
Defendant: First American Title Insurance
Case Number: 2:2012cv00740
Filed: July 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:0635
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 113 Motion to Dismiss: fifth cause of action for breach of fiduciary duty and request for punitive damages are dismissed with prejudice. Proposed amended scheduling order due within 14 days. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/31/16 (alt)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 123 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 127 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/18/16. (dla)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER- Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Non-Privileged Documents or in the Alternative Conduct in Camera Review of Privilege Claim 57 is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/10/2015. (las)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER- denying 57 Motion to Compel. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/31/2015. (las)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/02/2013. (tls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnsen and Allphin Properties v. First American Title Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnsen and Allphin Properties
Represented By: Nathan S. Dorius
Represented By: Brennan H. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance
Represented By: Michael A. Gehret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?