Perkumpulan Investor Crisis Center Dressel WBG v. Sherer et al

Plaintiff: Perkumpulan Investor Crisis Center Dressel WBG
Defendant: Jared Sherer and Michelle Sherer
Case Number: 2:2012cv00952
Filed: October 11, 2012
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 08:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 4 Motion to Remand - CASE CLOSED. Perkumpulan shall file a separate motion for and proof of costs and attorneys fees within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 6/5/13 (alt)
August 6, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 19 Motion for Costs and Attorney Fees: Plaintiff is awarded $31,156.00. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/6/13 (alt)
February 18, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 29 Motion to Vacate 27 Clerk's Judgment; denying 30 Motion to Disqualify Judge; granting 37 Motion for Sanctions; granting 38 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff shall file a separate motion for and proof of costs and attorneys fees within 14 days of this Order. Defendants may respond within 7 days of the filing of plaintiff's motion. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/18/15 (alt)
February 19, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 29 Motion to Vacate 27 Clerk's Judgment; denying 30 Motion to Disqualify Judge;denying 37 Motion for Sanctions; denying 38 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff shall file a separate motion for and proof of costs and attorneys fees on or before 3/5/15, and Defendants may respond to Plaintiff's motion and proof of costs and attorneys fees on or before 3/12/15. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/19/15 (alt)
May 12, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 44 Motion for Attorney Fees (Perkumpulan is awarded $22,627.50 in addition to the previous award of $31,156.00); denying 46 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/12/15 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkumpulan Investor Crisis Center Dressel WBG v. Sherer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perkumpulan Investor Crisis Center Dressel WBG
Represented By: Peter H. Donaldson
Represented By: Douglas A. Gross
Represented By: Allen M. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Sherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Sherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.