Kimbal v. Garden et al

Plaintiff: Paul Donald Kimbal
Defendant: Richard Garden, Kenneth Tubbs and Raymond Merrill
Case Number: 2:2012cv01069
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTgranting 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 9/30/2015. (kpf)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS, ANSWER and/or DISPOSITIVE MOTION.. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/5/2013. (kpf)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DENYING MOTIONSdenying 5 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner); denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. If it later appears that counsel may be needed or of specific help, the Court may ask an attorney to appear pro bono on Plaintiff's behalf. No further motions of this nature are necessary. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 7/23/2013. (kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimbal v. Garden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Donald Kimbal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Garden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Tubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?