Vision Security et al v. Xcentric Ventures

Plaintiff: Vision Security and Rob Harris
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures
Case Number: 2:2013cv00926
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J. Furse
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 79 Motion to Compel Deposition of Mr. Magedson. The parties are ORDERED to work together to find a convenient time to depose Mr. Magedson in Arizona. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 7/11/2016. (eat)
May 12, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 76 Motion for Alternative Service ; granting 77 Motion for Release of Vehicle Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/12/16. (jlw)
February 14, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order denying 5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/14/14. (jmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vision Security et al v. Xcentric Ventures
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vision Security
Represented By: Sonny J. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Harris
Represented By: Sonny J. Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures
Represented By: Jason P. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?