Strickland v. Demke et al
Plaintiff: Jake M. Strickland
Defendant: Whitney Vivian Demke, David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie, Pamela Taylor, Wood Crapo LLC, J. T. Y., Wood Jenkins LLC, J. K. Y. and LDS Family Services
Case Number: 2:2013cv01130
Filed: December 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2017 Filing 96 CLERK'S JUDGMENT signed by Chief Deputy Clerk - AWM. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's case is dismissed without prejudice. Case Closed. (blh)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/5/2017. (blh)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is directed to respond in writing within 10 days from the date of this order and inform the Court of the status of the case and intentions to proceed. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/17/2017. (blh)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Not Dismissing Case: On April 3, 2016, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause why Plaintiffs case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. On April 28, 2016, Plaintiff responded to the Courts Order, and explained that Plaintiff intends to pursue the action. Given Plaintiffs response, the Court declines to dismiss Plaintiffs case at this time. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/29/16. (jlw)
April 28, 2016 Filing 92 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time To File Proposed Attorney Planning Meeting Report and Case Management Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Hutchins, Wesley)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Plaintiffs are directed to respond in writing within 14 days from the date of this order and inform the Court of the status of the case and intentions to proceed. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/3/16. (jlw)
May 5, 2015 Filing 90 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Breanne D. Fors filed by Breanne D. Fors on behalf of David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie (Fors, Breanne)
March 30, 2015 Filing 89 REPLY BRIEF re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Decl of Robert S. Clark)(Kennedy, Laura)
March 30, 2015 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #87 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support (Motion to Strike Clark Declaration) filed by Defendants David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie. (Kennedy, Laura)
March 12, 2015 Filing 87 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support and Memorandum in Support (Motion to Strike Clark Declaration) filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A; Clark Declaration)(Hutchins, Wesley)
March 11, 2015 Filing 86 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support (Verified) filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A; Flitton Utah District Court Decision)(Hutchins, Wesley)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #84 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/4/15. (jlw)
March 3, 2015 Filing 84 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time KM Defendants' Motion for Rule 54 Attorney's Fees and Expenses and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutchins, Wesley)
March 3, 2015 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Whitney Vivian Demke.(Rose, Rick)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Whitney Vivian Demke answer due 3/3/2015. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 2/18/15. (jlw)
February 17, 2015 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura G. Kennedy on behalf of David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie (Kennedy, Laura)
February 17, 2015 Filing 80 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert S. Clark)(Clark, Robert)
February 17, 2015 Filing 79 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Complaint,,, filed by Defendant Whitney Vivian Demke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rose, Rick)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re 77 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss Party,, Order on Motion for Discovery, Motion Hearing. Follows oral order of 12/16/14. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 2/3/15. (jlw)
December 16, 2014 Filing 77 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Dee Benson: Cnsl present. After arguments were heard and discussion held, Court ruled: GRANTING #42 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING #44 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING #45 Motion to Dismiss Party; GRANTING in part and DENYING in part #48 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING #70 Motion for Discovery. Court made findings on the record. Counsel to prepare the order. Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2014 Written Order to follow oral order: Y. Attorney for Plaintiff: Wesley D. Hutchins, Attorney for Defendant Alan L. Sullivan, Rick Rose, Kenji Richards, James Gardner, Robert S. Clark and Monica Call. Court Reporter: Ed Young. (reb)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 11/4/14. (jlw)
November 4, 2014 Filing 75 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time Motion for Rule 52(d) Continuace to Conduct Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to File Reply Memo)(Hutchins, Wesley)
October 20, 2014 Filing 74 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #70 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support Motion for Rule 56(d) Continuance filed by Defendants J. K. Y., J. T. Y.. (Call, Monica)
October 20, 2014 Filing 73 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #70 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support Motion for Rule 56(d) Continuance filed by Defendant Whitney Vivian Demke. (Rose, Rick)
October 20, 2014 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #70 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support Motion for Rule 56(d) Continuance filed by Defendants David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie. (Clark, Robert)
October 20, 2014 Filing 71 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #70 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support Motion for Rule 56(d) Continuance filed by Defendants LDS Family Services, Pamela Taylor. (Gardner, James)
October 6, 2014 Filing 70 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery and Memorandum in Support Motion for Rule 56(d) Continuance filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In support of Rule 56(d) Motion)(Hutchins, Wesley)
October 2, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: #45 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kirton & McConkie, LLC, Larry S. Jenkins, and David J. Hardy and Memorandum in Support , #44 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support , #42 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support , #48 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support : (Notice generated by CHAMBERS) Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2014 02:30 PM in Rm 8.200 before Judge Dee Benson. Court Address: NEW COURTHOUSE - 351 South West Temple, Salt Lake City, Utah (reb)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 7/2/14. (jlw)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 7/2/14. (jlw)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - ENTRY ERROR*** ORDER granting #60 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 7/2/14. (jlw) Modified on 7/17/2014 by adding error information (jlw).
July 2, 2014 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants J. K. Y., J. T. Y.. (Call, Monica)
July 2, 2014 Filing 64 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kirton & McConkie, LLC, Larry S. Jenkins, and David J. Hardy and Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie. (Clark, Robert)
July 2, 2014 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants LDS Family Services, Pamela Taylor. (Gardner, James)
July 2, 2014 Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Whitney Vivian Demke. (Rose, Rick)
June 30, 2014 Filing 61 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Reply Memornadum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants LDS Family Services, Pamela Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Alan)
June 30, 2014 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Reply Memo in Supp of Defs Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fors, Breanne)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #42 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support Replies due by 7/2/2014. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 06/03/2014. (tls)
May 30, 2014 Filing 58 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Memoranda In Support of Pending Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants LDS Family Services, Pamela Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, James)
May 27, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Address by Breanne D. Fors (Fors, Breanne)
May 22, 2014 Filing 56 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A; Utah Code Ann. 78B-6-121, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B; Utah Code Ann. 78B-6-122)(Hutchins, Wesley)
May 22, 2014 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #48 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A; photo, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B; photo, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C; photo, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D; photo, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E; photo, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F; photo, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G; photo, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H; photo)(Hutchins, Wesley)
May 22, 2014 Filing 54 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A; Affidavit of Kyle Rathjen (with Exhibit 1 thereto), #3 Exhibit Exhibit B; Courtesy Copy of Felony Sale of a Child Statute (UCA 76-7-203), #4 Exhibit Exhibit C; Declaration of Cory R. Wall)(Hutchins, Wesley)
May 21, 2014 Filing 53 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #45 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kirton & McConkie, LLC, Larry S. Jenkins, and David J. Hardy and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A; "Child Placement Agreement", #3 Exhibit Exhibit B; Declaration of Cory R. Wall, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C; state court docket in paternity matter, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D; Order Certifying to Utah Supreme Court, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E; portion of pleading relying on fraud immunity (1), #7 Exhibit Exhibit F; portion of pleading relying on fraud immunity (2), #8 Exhibit Exhibit G; portion of pleading relying on fraud immmunity (3), #9 Exhibit Exhibit H; portion of pleading relying on fraud immunity (4), #10 Exhibit Exhibit I; Portion of Utah Adoption Council Website including re-posting of the Guides, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J; Amended Verified Petition in Carlton district court matter, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K; Courtesy copy of Virginia Supreme Court case in John Wyatt matter)(Hutchins, Wesley)
May 21, 2014 Filing 52 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutchins, Wesley)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 5/5/14. (jlw)
May 1, 2014 Filing 50 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Plaintiffs' Opposition to All Motions to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutchins, Wesley)
April 2, 2014 Filing 49 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time Filing Plaintiffs' Opposition to All Motions to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support (response due 5/5/2014) filed by Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hutchins, Wesley)
March 7, 2014 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Whitney Vivian Demke. (Rose, Rick)
March 5, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Kenji Richards on behalf of Whitney Vivian Demke (Richards, Adam)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Whitney Vivian Demke answer due 3/7/2014. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/4/14. (jlw)
March 3, 2014 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kirton & McConkie, LLC, Larry S. Jenkins, and David J. Hardy and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie. (Clark, Robert)
March 3, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants J. K. Y., J. T. Y.. (Call, Monica)
March 3, 2014 Filing 43 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Complaint,,, - or otherwise respond - filed by Defendant Whitney Vivian Demke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rose, Rick)
February 26, 2014 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants LDS Family Services, Pamela Taylor. (Sullivan, Alan)
February 11, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Breanne D. Fors on behalf of David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie (Fors, Breanne)
February 11, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Clark on behalf of David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie (Clark, Robert)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #27 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/27/2014. (jds)
January 30, 2014 Filing 38 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS KIRTON & MCCONKIE LLC, LARRY S. JENKINS, AND DAVID J. HARDY Acknowledgment filed by David J. Hardy.Kirton & McConkie served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014. (Hutchins, Wesley)
January 30, 2014 Filing 37 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS LDS FAMILY SERVICES AND PAMELA TAYLOR Acknowledgment filed by LDS Family Services. (Hutchins, Wesley)
January 30, 2014 Filing 36 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT WHITNEY VIVIAN DEMKE Acknowledgment filed by Whitney Vivian Demke. (Hutchins, Wesley)
January 30, 2014 Filing 35 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT WHITNEY VIVIAN DEMKE Acknowledgment filed by Whitney Vivian Demke.Whitney Vivian Demke served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014. (Hutchins, Wesley)
January 30, 2014 Filing 34 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS J.T.Y. AND J.K.Y. Acknowledgment filed by J. K. Y..J. T. Y. served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014. (Hutchins, Wesley)
January 30, 2014 Filing 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE UPON DEFENDANTS LDS FAMILY SERVICES AND PAMELA TAYLOR Acknowledgment filed by LDS Family Services.Pamela Taylor served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014. (Hutchins, Wesley)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants J.K.Y. and J.T.Y. shall have thirty (30) days after their counsel signs J.T.Y. 's acceptance ofservice to answer, reply or otherwise plead to the Verified Complaint. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/27/14. (jlw)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #14 Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Whitney Vivian Demke, 'k/a Whitney Vivian Pettersson shall have thirty (30) days after her counsel signs the acceptance of service to answer, reply or otherwise plead to the Verified Complaint. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 1/22/14. (jlw)
January 24, 2014 Filing 30 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants J. K. Y., J. T. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time)(Call, Monica)
January 24, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica S. Call on behalf of J. K. Y., J. T. Y. (Call, Monica)
January 24, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Black on behalf of J. K. Y., J. T. Y. (Black, Kenneth)
January 21, 2014 Filing 27 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Defendants LDS Family Services, Pamela Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, James)
January 21, 2014 Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - or otherwise respond to the Verified Complaint filed by Defendant Whitney Vivian Demke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rose, Rick)
January 17, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas P. Farr on behalf of LDS Family Services, Pamela Taylor (Farr, Douglas)
January 17, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan L. Sullivan on behalf of LDS Family Services, Pamela Taylor (Sullivan, Alan)
January 17, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by James Delos Gardner on behalf of LDS Family Services, Pamela Taylor (Gardner, James)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF RECUSAL Judge Robert J. Shelby recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dee Benson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 01/09/2014. (tls)
January 7, 2014 Filing 21 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Whitney Vivian Demke. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw)
December 30, 2013 Filing 20 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to J. K. Y.. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (blh)
December 30, 2013 Filing 19 Modification of Docket: Error: Documents filed using incorrect event types. Correction: Docket text stricken from incorrect entries. Documents properly filed at subsequent entries. (tls)
December 27, 2013 Filing 18 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to David J. Hardy. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw)
December 27, 2013 Filing 17 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to LDS Family Services. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw)
December 27, 2013 Filing 16 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Larry S. Jenkins. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (amw)
December 27, 2013 Filing 15 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Kirton & McConkie. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service., **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jake M. Strickland (amw)
December 27, 2013 Filing 14 COMPLAINT against Whitney Vivian Demke, David J. Hardy, Larry S. Jenkins, Kirton & McConkie, LDS Family Services, Pamela Taylor, Wood Crapo LLC, Wood Jenkins LLC, J. K. Y., J. T. Y. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-1969920), filed by Jake M. Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet #1, #2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X) Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Hutchins, Wesley)
December 27, 2013 Filing 13 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT> Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jake M. Strickland as to David J. Hardy. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed using incorrect event type document is a summons to be issued (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 12 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jake M. Strickland as to Larry S. Jenkins. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed using incorrect event type document is a summons to be issued (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 11 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jake M. Strickland as to LDS Family Services. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed using incorrect event type document is a summons to be issued. (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 10 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jake M. Strickland as to Kirton & McConkie. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed using incorrect event type document is a summons to be issued. (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 9 EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 8 EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 7 EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 6 EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 5 EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 4 EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 3 EXHIBITS filed by Jake M. Strickland re #2 Complaint. (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Pages 1 through 10 against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-1969920), filed by Jake M. Strickland. Assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby (Hutchins, Wesley) Modified on 12/30/2013 by striking through docket text. Document was initially filed incorrectly and was refiled in its entirety at #14 (tls).
December 27, 2013 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Plaintiff Jake M. Strickland is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (blh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strickland v. Demke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Vivian Demke
Represented By: Rick L. Rose
Represented By: Adam Kenji Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Hardy
Represented By: Laura G. Kennedy
Represented By: Robert S. Clark
Represented By: Breanne D. Fors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry S. Jenkins
Represented By: Laura G. Kennedy
Represented By: Robert S. Clark
Represented By: Breanne D. Fors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirton & McConkie
Represented By: Laura G. Kennedy
Represented By: Robert S. Clark
Represented By: Breanne D. Fors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Taylor
Represented By: Douglas P. Farr
Represented By: Alan L. Sullivan
Represented By: James Delos Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood Crapo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. T. Y.
Represented By: Monica S. Call
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood Jenkins LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. K. Y.
Represented By: Monica S. Call
Represented By: Kenneth B. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LDS Family Services
Represented By: Douglas P. Farr
Represented By: Alan L. Sullivan
Represented By: James Delos Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake M. Strickland
Represented By: Wesley D. Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?