Zimmerman v. University of Utah
Plaintiff: Judith Pinborough Zimmerman
Defendant: University of Utah
Case Number: 2:2013cv01131
Filed: December 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 247 Dr. Zimmermans Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 250 Dr. Zimmermans Motion to Amend Judgment to Include Prejudgment Interest; denying 257 The University of Utahs Motion for Review of the Clerks Taxation of Costs. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/25/2019. (jds)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 215 Defendants Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/5/2018. (jds)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: The 121 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Specifically, the court orders as follows: 1) Pursuant to Dr. Zimmerman's withdrawal, Dr. Zimmerman� 39;s fifth cause of action under the Rehab Act is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety. 2) The court GRANTS summary judgment IN FAVOR OF THE UNIVERSITY on Dr. Zimmerman's second cause of action under 42 U.S.C. Section 1983. 3) Dr. Zimmerman CAN STILL MAINTAIN HER SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DR. MCMAHON IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY under 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 - but only to the extent she seeks prospective injunctive relief. 4) In all other respects, the defendants' motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/17/18. (dla)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order GRANTING 103 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and DISMISSING Plaintiff's Seventh Cause of Action with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/14/17. (jlw)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 80 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ; granting 84 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 87 Motion to Amend/Correct. The court concludes that Dr. Zimmermans Second, Ninth, and Tenth Causes of Action are dismissed without prejudice, but grants her leave to amend her complaint as stipulated by the parties. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/21/16. (jlw)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 71 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 7/1/16. (jlw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zimmerman v. University of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Pinborough Zimmerman
Represented By: Melyssa D. Davidson
Represented By: Lisa R. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?