Towner v. USAA Federal Savings Bank
Plaintiff: Mark Edward Towner
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Case Number: 2:2014cv00148
Filed: February 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Presiding Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADOPTING 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 64 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 71 Motion to Strike: Plaintiff's sole cause of action, the Fair Credit Reporting Act claim, is dismissed. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/2/15 (alt)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 67 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/29/14 (alt)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ADOPTING 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; adopting Report and Recommendations re 37 Motion for Extension of Time (denied), 38 Motion for Leave to File (denied), 46 Motion to Seal (denied), 48 Motion re Ex Parte Submissions (granting), 24 Motion to Amend Answer (granted), 26 Motion to Amend Complaint (granted in part-denied in part), 34 Motion to Amend Answer (granted). Plaintiff must file his amended complaint within 7 days of this order; Defendant must file its amended answer within 7 days from the date Plaintiff files his amended complaint. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/21/14 (alt)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 49 Motion for Protective Order: deposition rescheduling timelines and topic limitations set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/14/14 (alt)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 27 Motion to Remove Defendant's pro hac vice Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/6/2014. (blh)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 16 Motion to File Amended Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/23/14 (alt)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 Motion to Strike 5 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 6/11/14 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Towner v. USAA Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Edward Towner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?