Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard et al v. Robertson
Plaintiff: Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard, Houweling Utah Property, HNL Holdings, Houweling Utah Holdings and HNL Utah Holding
Defendant: George Robertson
Counter_claimant: George Robertson, HNL Holdings, Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard, Houweling Utah Property, Houweling Utah Holdings and HNL Utah Holding
Counter_defendant: HNL Holdings, HNL Utah Holding, Houweling Utah Holdings, Houweling Utah Property, Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard and George Robertson
Thirdparty_plaintiff: HNL Holdings, Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard, Houweling Utah Property, Houweling Utah Holdings and HNL Utah Holding
Thirdparty_defendant: HNL Holdings, Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard, Houweling Utah Property, Houweling Utah Holdings and HNL Utah Holding
Case Number: 2:2014cv00611
Filed: August 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Juab
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Shelby
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Docket entry 113 refiled unsealed per 114 . Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/11/17. (dla)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order denying 59 Motion to Amend Counterclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 12/30/16. (jlw)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 59 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and Re-Open Fact Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 11/23/16. (jlw)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying as moot 33 Motion to modify the subpoena; denying 39 Motion to modify the subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/26/16 (alt)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 21 Motion for Discovery; denying 21 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/12/2015. (jwt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard et al v. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houweling Utah Property
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HNL Holdings
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houweling Utah Holdings
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HNL Utah Holding
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Robertson
Represented By: John H. Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: George Robertson
Represented By: John H. Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: HNL Holdings
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Houweling Utah Property
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Houweling Utah Holdings
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: HNL Utah Holding
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: HNL Holdings
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: HNL Utah Holding
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Houweling Utah Holdings
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Houweling Utah Property
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: George Robertson
Represented By: John H. Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: HNL Holdings
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Houweling Utah Property
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Houweling Utah Holdings
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: HNL Utah Holding
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: HNL Holdings
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Houweling's Nurseries Oxnard
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Houweling Utah Property
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Houweling Utah Holdings
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: HNL Utah Holding
Represented By: Emily Diane Kummer
Represented By: Paul D. Veasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?