Diesel Power Source et al v. Crazy Carl's Turbos et al
Plaintiff: Diesel Power Source and Bret Park
Defendant: Crazy Carl's Turbos and Carl Tetreault
Case Number: 2:2014cv00826
Filed: November 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER finding as moot 51 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 58 Motion for Leave to File 2nd Amended Complaint. Pla is to file the 2nd Amended Complaint on or before 3/31/17. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/24/17 (alt)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 50 Motion for Sanctions; denying 75 Motion for Order to Show Cause; denying 75 Motion for Sanctions; denying 78 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 2/23/17 (alt)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 52 Motion for Protective Order; taking under advisement 50 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 1/5/17 (alt)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/10/15 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diesel Power Source et al v. Crazy Carl's Turbos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diesel Power Source
Represented By: Beau J. Olsen
Represented By: Mitchell J. Olsen
Represented By: Spencer W. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Park
Represented By: Beau J. Olsen
Represented By: Mitchell J. Olsen
Represented By: Spencer W. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crazy Carl's Turbos
Represented By: Brian T. Boyd
Represented By: Jennifer A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Tetreault
Represented By: Jennifer A. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?