Mrs. Fields Franchising v. MFGPC
Plaintiff: Mrs. Fields Franchising
Defendant: MFGPC
Cross_defendant: Mrs. Fields Famous Brands and Mrs. Fields Confections
Counter_claimant: MFGPC
Counter_defendant: Mrs. Fields Confections, Mrs. Fields Famous Brands and Mrs. Fields Franchising
Case Number: 2:2015cv00094
Filed: February 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 183 Motion for Joinder of Perfect Snax Prime; finding as moot 185 Motion for Clarification on Whether to Permit Joinder of Perfect Snax Prime, LLC as Counterclaim Defendant re 183 MOTION for Joinder of Mrs. Fie lds Famous Brands and Perfect Snax Prime, LLC as Counterclaim Defendants. MFGPC is HEREBY ORDERED to file an Amended Counterclaim that comports with the courts orders regarding the Motion to Amend (ECF Nos. 171 and 184 ) within SEVEN DAYS of this Order. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/5/2019. (jwt)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 147 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/19/2019. (jds)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting in Part 139 MFGPC's Motion to Amend and Ordering Supplemental Briefing: The court grants MFGPC leave to file an amended counterclaim and crossclaim/third-party complaint adding claims for injunctive and declaratory relief. But the court reserves judgment on whether MFGPC may add the Doe Defendants and whether MFGPC may revise the case caption. Within TEN DAYS of this Order, MFGPC shall file a supplemental memorandum of no more than 5 pages specifying whether the claims against Famous Brands and the proposed claims against Doe Defendants, are crossclaim or third-party claims. MFGPC may also move to cure the joinder of Famous Brands. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of Famous Brands for improper joinder. Within seven days of the court's ruling on the motion to revise the case caption, MFGPC shall file its amended complaint. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/8/19. (dla)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting MFGPC's Motion for Summary Judgment: MFGPC's Motion for Summary Judgment 120 is GRANTED IN PART. The only issue that remains is damages. Mrs. Fields' Motion for Summary Judgmen t 99 is DENIED. MFGPC is instructed to inform the court within seven days of the date of this order whether it still seeks leave to amend. The remaining motions - MFGPC's Motion Under Rule 56(d) to Defer or Deny Consideration of Defendants 9; Motion for Summary Judgment 102 and MFGPC's Request for a Status and Scheduling Conference 103 - are DENIED AS MOOT. The parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer so that they can propose a schedule for discovery and motions related to the issue of damages. The parties shall propose a scheduling order within fourteen days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/20/18. (dla)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mrs. Fields Franchising v. MFGPC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Fields Franchising
Represented By: Rod N. Andreason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MFGPC
Represented By: James A. Dumas
Represented By: Peter W. Guyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Mrs. Fields Famous Brands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Mrs. Fields Confections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MFGPC
Represented By: James A. Dumas
Represented By: Peter W. Guyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mrs. Fields Confections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mrs. Fields Famous Brands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Mrs. Fields Franchising
Represented By: Rod N. Andreason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?