Bacon v. Winder et al

Plaintiff: Michael A. Bacon
Defendant: James M. Winder, Todd R. Wilcox, Brad Lewis and Eric Lindley
Case Number: 2:2015cv00145
Filed: March 4, 2015
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Bruce S. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 61 MEMORANDUM DECISION & THIRD ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS: The United States Marshals Service is again directed to serve a properly issued summons and a copy of Plaintiff's amended complaint, along with this Order, up the following Salt Lake County related defendants: Patrick Gee and Deputy Backman. Denying 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel. NO FURTHER MOTIONS OF THIS NATURE WILL BE ACCEPTED HERE; Granting 46 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Granting 47 Motion to Quash; Denying 53 Motion to Strike; Denying 54 Motion to Strike; Denying 58 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Denying 59 Motion for Default Judgment. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 05/07/2018. (kpf)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 40 MEMORANDUM DECISION & SECOND ORDER REQUIRING SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS. The United States Marshals Service is again directed to serve properly issued summons and a copy of the Plaintiffs Amended Complaint along with this order, upon the following Salt Lake County related defendants: Todd R. Wilcox, Brad Lewis, Eric Lindley, Patrick Gee and Deputy Backman. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/09/2018. (kpf)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order 34 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT & ORDERING SERVICE ON REMAINING DEFENDANTS. Granting 32 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). The United States Marshals Service shall serve a summons, a copy of Plaintiffs complaint, and a copy of this Order upon Defendants FNU Backman, Patrick Gee, Brad Lewis, Eric Lindley, Todd R. Wilcox. Defendant Denerio is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/15/2017. (kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacon v. Winder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd R. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lindley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?