Glenn v. Moss et al
Plaintiff: Endre Glenn
Defendant: Brennan H. Moss and Pia Anderson Dorius Reynard & Moss
Case Number: 2:2015cv00165
Filed: March 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 139 Motion to Reopen Case; denying 141 Motion for New Trial; denying 141 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/29/18 (alt)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 135 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 135 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/29/17 (alt)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: accepting 119 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 101 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment, granting 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment, grantin g in part and denying in part 100 Motion to Strike 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 95 Motion for Summary Judgment is stricken ; finding as moot 113 Motion in Limine; granting 125 Motion to Strike 123 Reply Brief ; denying 125 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply; denying 131 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/19/2017. (jds)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER affirming Magistrate Judge's 81 Order denying 75 and 76 Motions. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 12/20/16 (alt)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 45 Motion for Sanctions; granting 63 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply; denying 54 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 62 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/17/2016. (blh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn v. Moss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endre Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brennan H. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pia Anderson Dorius Reynard & Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?