Golden et al v. Mentor Capital et al
Plaintiff: Gena Golden and Susan Golden
Defendant: Mentor Capital, Labertew & Associates and Michael L. Labertew
Case Number: 2:2015cv00176
Filed: March 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15:0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - GRANTING 152 Plaintiffs Rule 41 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice and for Stay of Summary Judgment Briefing; Mentors request that it be declared a prevailing party is DENIED; DENIED as moot 131 Men tors Motion for Reconsideration, 150 Mentors Motion for Summary Judgment, and 151 Defendant Labertew & Associates and Michael L. Labertews Motion for Summary Judgment; The court VACATES 124 Memorandum Decision & Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. A separate order will issue addressing Mentors third-party claims. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/25/2018. (jds)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting 140 Motion for Second Extension. Dispositive motions due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 11/29/17. (dla)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting 127 Motion to Stay. Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay the discovery order is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 10/13/17. (dla)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting 70 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of their Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/22/17. (dla)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 108 Mentor's Motion to Compel Complete Discovery Responses from Gena and Susan Golden; granting 109 Mentor's Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses from Richard Golden. Mentor's request for costs and fees in bringing the respective motions is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 9/5/2017. (blh)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Lift the Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the temporary stay of discovery as to Mr. Van Rixel is lifted and the discovery requests served in April 2017 are reinstated. Mr. Van Rixel is given fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to respond to the discovery request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 8/18/17. (jlw)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 79 Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint for insufficient service of process. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/3/17. (jlw)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 97 Motion to Quash and to stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 07/12/17. (jlw)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting in part 93 Motion to Compel. The court will award $1040.25 in costs and fees. The court discounts the amount by half giving credit to Plaintiffs for some cooperation in the discovery process given their health challenges.Defendants are ORDERED to provide the court and Plaintiffs with an affidavit of costs and fees associated with bringing this motion within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Upon receipt, Plaintiffs will have fourteen (14) days to pay the required amount of costs and fees to Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 6/1/17. (jlw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden et al v. Mentor Capital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gena Golden
Represented By: Sean N. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Golden
Represented By: Sean N. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labertew & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Labertew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?