Solid Q Holdings v. Arenal Energy et al
Plaintiff: Solid Q Holdings
Defendant: Arenal Energy, Richard Reincke, Eric Johnson, Brian Chaplik, Gus Shouse, Tom Buiel and Chris Cota
Case Number: 2:2015cv00419
Filed: June 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 83 Motion to Stay pending the resolution of the criminal charges against Mr. Reincke. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/23/18 (alt)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 73 Motion to Set Aside Default as to dft Richard Reincke. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/24/18 (alt)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/23/17 (alt)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 54 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/8/17 (alt)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting without prejudice 44 Motion to Dismiss second claim for relief against Brian Chaplik. Plaintiff may file a complaint amending the second cause of action within 14 days. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/27/17 (alt)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 23 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/1/16 (alt)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 13 Motion for Entry of Default. Arenal Energy is to file its Answer to the Complaint with the Clerk of the Court within 10 days of this Order. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/30/15 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solid Q Holdings v. Arenal Energy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solid Q Holdings
Represented By: Patrick J. Ascione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arenal Energy
Represented By: Paul W. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Reincke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Chaplik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gus Shouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Buiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Cota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?