Israel v. University of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Esther Israel
Defendant: University of Utah, Donald Steven Strassberg, Jordan Elizabeth Rullo, Julia Mackaronis, Kelly Kinnish and Michael Miner
Case Number: 2:2015cv00741
Filed: October 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J. Furse
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs first, second, fourth, and fifth causes of action are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs third cause of action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/7/18. (jlw)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply - due by 6/25/2018. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/19/18. (jlw)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting Defendant University of Utah's 51 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's claims against the University of Utah are dismissed without prejudice. University of Utah terminated. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/18/2017. (eat)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Service Expenses and Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/4/2016. (eat)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Israel v. University of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Steven Strassberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Elizabeth Rullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Mackaronis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Kinnish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?