Jese v. Dennis
Plaintiff: Frank Jese
Defendant: Tim Dennis
Case Number: 2:2016cv00227
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Sanpete
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM DECISION & DISMISSAL ORDER: It is therefore ordered that the complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. This action is closed. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/04/2019. (kpf)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER REQUIRING MARTINEZ REPORT and DISPOSITIVE MOTION: Denying 24 Motion for Hearing. Defendant must within 90 days file a Martinez Report. When served with a Martinez Report, Plaintiff may submit a response within 30 days of the report's filing date. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/09/2018. (kpf)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: It is hereby ordered that: If the State is unable to accept service of process for the defendant identified above, the State shall disclose to the USMS any information in its records that may help in identifying. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 02/15/2017. (kpf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jese v. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Jese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?