United States of America et al v. St. Mark's Hospital et al
Plaintiff: United States of America and Gerald Polukoff
Defendant: St Mark's Hospital, Intermountain Healthcare, Inc, Sherman Sorensen, Sorensen Cardiovascular Group, HCA, Inc. and Intermountain Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2016cv00304
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 537 MEMORANDUM DECISION -Granting 520 Expedited Motion to Compel Non-Party The University of Utah to Produce Documents Withheld Based On Asserted Privilege. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 9/21/20. (alf)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 526 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: granting 460 Relator's Motion for Leave to Amend Relator's Third Amended Complaint for Damages and Other Relief Under the False Claims Act; denying 458 Expedited Motion to Quash or Limit R elator's FRCP 45 Subpoena to St. Mark's Hospital; granting 459 Relator's Amended Expedited Motion to Compel Defendants to Produce Responsive Medical Records; denying 474 Relator's Expedited Motion to Compel Defendant Sherman S orensen, M.D. to Provide Complete and Responsive Interrogatory Answers; denying 476 Relator's Expedited Motion to Compel Defendant Sorensen Cardiovascular Group to Provide Complete and Responsive Interrogatory Answers; denying 477 Sorensen D efendants' Expedited Motion to Compel Compliance with the Court's Order and Request for Sanctions and Fees; denying 505 Relator's Emergency Motion Filed Under Seal for Leave to Supplement; granting 519 Relator's Motion to Modify the Court's Prior Order Granting an Extension of Expert Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 8/20/2020. (jds)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 524 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 384 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot 381 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 8/19/20 (alt) Modified on 8/19/2020: corrected name of judge (alt)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 503 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 380 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dfts' Expert Dr. John Lassetter; denying 383 Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Dfts' Expert Jonathan M. Tobis, M.D. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/17/20 (alt)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 491 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 296 Motion to Exclude Experts; denying 297 Motion to Strike Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 6/3/20 (alt)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 439 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER overruling Objection of Magistrate Judge Decision. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/20/2020. (las)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 430 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 332 Motion to Deny or Defer Consideration of Sorensen Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 300 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/9/2020. (las)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - It is ORDERED that Defendants objection (Docket No. 385 ) is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 2/25/2020. (las)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 354 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/17/2020. (las)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 254 Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/25/2019. (las)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER withdrawing 267 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 267 Motion for Leave to take Additional Discovery. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 9/16/2019. (las)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 168 IHC Motion to Dismiss ; finding as moot 170 Motion to Stay ; granting 172 Dr. Sorensen's Motion to Dismiss ; finding as moot 173 Motion to Stay ; finding as moot 175 Motion to Stay ; granting 190 St. Mark's Motion to Dismiss ; denying 204 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 1/19/17. (jlw)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 4/13/2016. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 4/14/2016.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. St. Mark's Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sandra L. Steinvoort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Polukoff
Represented By: Gregory D. Brown
Represented By: David L. Hobbs
Represented By: Jessica A. Kasischke
Represented By: Rand P. Nolen
Represented By: Kelsey L. Stokes
Represented By: Rhome D. Zabriskie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Mark's Hospital
Represented By: W. David Bridgers
Represented By: Wells Trompeter Hoffman
Represented By: Andrew A. Warth
Represented By: D. Loren Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intermountain Healthcare, Inc
Represented By: Sammi V. Anderson
Represented By: Asher D. Funk
Represented By: Daniel S. Reinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Sorensen
Represented By: Blaine J. Benard
Represented By: Gregory E. Goldberg
Represented By: Darren G. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sorensen Cardiovascular Group
Represented By: Blaine J. Benard
Represented By: Gregory E. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA, Inc.
Represented By: W. David Bridgers
Represented By: Wells Trompeter Hoffman
Represented By: Andrew A. Warth
Represented By: D. Loren Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intermountain Medical Center
Represented By: Sammi V. Anderson
Represented By: Asher D. Funk
Represented By: Daniel S. Reinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?