Hemingway et al v. Russo et al
Plaintiff: Trudy Hemingway, Daniel McGuire, Aaron Christensen and Michael McGuire
Defendant: E. Robert Russo, Christopher McHugh, Bradley Bailey, Daniel Bartlett, Daniel Morzelewski, Kevin Wyatt, Cottonwood Heights City and Unified Police Department
Case Number: 2:2016cv00313
Filed: April 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Shelby
Presiding Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Re: Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/7/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Draft Preliminary Instructions, # 2 Appendix Draft General Final Instructions, # 3 Appendix Draft Substantive Final Instructions, # 4 Appendix Draft Post-Argument Instructions)(jph)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 87 Defendants Motion in Limine Re: Courts Memorandum Decisions and Orders; denying 90 Defendants Motion in Limine Re: Plaintiffs Proposed Trial Exhibit 21; deferring until trial 89 Defendants Motion in Limine Re: Plaintiffs Proposed Trial Exhibits 18 and 19; denying 88 Defendants Motion in Limine Re: Plaintiffs Proposed Trial Exhibit 12. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/4/2018. (jds)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part. Plaintiff's motion is DENIED. Plaintiffs' second, third, fourth, and fifth causes of action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendant Bradley Bailey is entitled to qualified immunity. Plaintiffs' claims against him are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendant Kevin Wyatt is entitled to qualified immunity. Plaintiffs' claims against him are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. In all other respects, Defendants' motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/27/2018. (mas)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ; denying 44 Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs second, third, fourth, and fifth causes of action are DIS MISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendant Bradley Bailey is entitled to qualified immunity. Plaintiffs claims against him are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendant Kevin Wyatt is entitled to qualified immunity. Plaintiffs claims against him are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. In all other respects, Defendants motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 6/22/2018. (jds)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 35 Short Form Motion to Compel Answers to Three Interrogatories. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to provide complete responses to Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, and 5 within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/25/17. (dla)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemingway et al v. Russo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy Hemingway
Represented By: R. Shane Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McGuire
Represented By: R. Shane Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Christensen
Represented By: R. Shane Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McGuire
Represented By: R. Shane Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Robert Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Morzelewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottonwood Heights City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?