Cinemapub v. Petilos et al
Plaintiff: Cinemapub and Cinemapub LLC doing business as Brewvies
Defendant: Petilos, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Steven B. Bateman, Nina McDermott, Amanda Smith, Cade Meier, Olivia Vela Agraz, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Jeffrey Wright and S. Neal Berube
Case Number: 2:2016cv00318
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Vanessa R. Walsh filed by Ross C. Anderson on behalf of Cinemapub (Anderson, Ross)
February 23, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Greg Soderberg filed by David N. Wolf on behalf of Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright (Wolf, David)
January 23, 2018 Filing 105 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #101 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support Regarding Interim Legal Services filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
January 23, 2018 Filing 104 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #86 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
January 23, 2018 Filing 103 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #101 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support Regarding Interim Legal Services filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Fifth Declaration of Ross C. Anderson)(Anderson, Ross)
January 11, 2018 Filing 102 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #101 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support Regarding Interim Legal Services filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Wolf, David)
December 29, 2017 Filing 101 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support Regarding Interim Legal Services filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 of Exhibits)(Walsh, Vanessa)
December 20, 2017 Filing 100 Plaintiff's RESPONSE re #99 Objections,,to Declarations Attached to Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by Cinemapub. (Walsh, Vanessa)
December 13, 2017 Filing 99 OBJECTIONS to declarations attached as exhibits to #98 Reply Memorandum/Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Wolf, David)
December 7, 2017 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits to Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Walsh, Vanessa)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #95 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #96 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #86 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees: Reply Memo due by 12/12/2017. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/22/17 (alt)
November 21, 2017 Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #86 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Vanessa)
November 21, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walsh, Vanessa)
November 20, 2017 Filing 94 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 3,773.35 for Plaintiff against and Defendants; signed by AWM, Chief Deputy Clerk on 11/20/17 (alt)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Memo. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/15/17 (alt)
November 13, 2017 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #86 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits to Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Wolf, David)
November 13, 2017 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Overlength Memorandum)(Soderberg, Gregory)
October 30, 2017 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Ross C. Anderson in Support re #86 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits to Supplemental Declaration)(Walsh, Vanessa)
October 30, 2017 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Ross C. Anderson in Support re #86 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5)(Walsh, Vanessa) Modified on 10/30/2017: removed unnecessary text (alt)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #87 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/24/17 (alt)
October 20, 2017 Filing 87 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Purposed] Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Wolf, David)
October 16, 2017 Filing 86 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Declaration Exhibits 1-9)(Walsh, Vanessa)
October 16, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa R. Walsh on behalf of Cinemapub (Walsh, Vanessa)
October 16, 2017 Modification of Docket re #84 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees. Correction: At the request of counsel, motion is being terminated as erroneous and will be re-filed. (alt)
October 14, 2017 Filing 84 ERRONEOUS FILING - WILL BE RE-FILED CORRECTLY - Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits to Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs and Memorandum in Suppor)(Anderson, Ross) Modified on 10/16/2017: terminated as erroneous upon request from filer (alt)
October 12, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross C. Anderson on behalf of Cinemapub (Anderson, Ross)
October 5, 2017 Filing 82 BILL OF COSTS Plaintiff's Memorandum of Costs under 28 U.S.C. 1920 and Verification of Bill of Costs under 28 U.S.C. 1924 filed by Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
October 3, 2017 Filing 81 JUDGMENT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief entered in favor of Cinemapub and against Amanda Smith, Cade Meier, Jeffrey Wright, John T. Nielsen, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Olivia Vela Agraz, S. Neal Berube, Salvador D. Petilos, Steven B. Bateman - CASE CLOSED. Taxation of costs and determination by the Court of motion for the award of attorneys fees, expenses, and costs, will occur after case is closed. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 10/3/17 (alt)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting #56 Motion for Summary Judgment Granting Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Relief; denying #57 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot #69 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 8/31/2017. (blh)
July 27, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Parker Douglas filed by Gregory M. Soderberg on behalf of Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright (Soderberg, Gregory)
July 20, 2017 Deadlines/Hearings terminated. All scheduled deadlines/hearings have been vacated per the stay order #78 . (asb)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Motion to Stay all scheduled deadlines and other dates pending disposition of the parties pending motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 7/19/17 (alt)
July 17, 2017 Filing 77 Joint MOTION to Stay All Scheduled Deadlines Pending Decisions on Plaintiff's and Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay All Scheduled Deadlines Pending Decisions on Plaintiff's and Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment)(Anderson, Ross)
May 22, 2017 Filing 76 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #69 MOTION to Reconsider re #62 Order on Motion to Exclude, Memorandum Decision filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
May 22, 2017 Filing 75 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #57 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
May 22, 2017 Filing 74 REQUEST to Submit for Decision re #56 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Relief filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
May 20, 2017 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 MOTION to Reconsider re #62 Order on Motion to Exclude, Memorandum Decision filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting in part, denying in part #70 Joint MOTION to Stay. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 9/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. 3-Day Bench Trial set for 10/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/8/17 (alt)
May 8, 2017 Filing 71 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Reconsider re #62 Order on Motion to Exclude, Memorandum Decision filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Soderberg, Gregory)
May 5, 2017 Filing 70 Joint MOTION to Stay re #47 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion for Scheduling Order,, to Stay All Scheduled Deadlines Pending Decisions on Plaintiff's and Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay All Scheduled Deadlines Pending Decisions on Plaintiff's and Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment)(Anderson, Ross)
April 25, 2017 Modification of Docket re #69 MOTION to Reconsider re #62 Order on Motion to Exclude, Memorandum Decision. Error: Relief entered incorrectly and not linked to underlying order. Correction: Text corrected and link added to order in question. (alt)
April 22, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION to Reconsider re #62 Order on Motion to Exclude, , Memorandum Decision and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross) Modified on 4/25/2017: corrected text and added link to underlying order (alt)
April 17, 2017 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #57 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - McDermott Deposition pp. 92-93, #2 Exhibit 2 - Miller Deposition pp. 65-66)(Soderberg, Gregory)
April 14, 2017 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Relief filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
April 3, 2017 Filing 66 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #56 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - McDermott Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Request for Admission)(Soderberg, Gregory)
April 1, 2017 Filing 65 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #57 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Appendix Index of Exhibits to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Anderson, Ross)
March 27, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL of Janet M. Conway filed by Ross C. Anderson and Janet M. Conway on behalf of Cinemapub (Anderson, Ross)
March 23, 2017 Filing 63 REQUEST for Oral Argument re #57 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support , #56 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Declaratory Relief and Supporting Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting #44 Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions; denying #45 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. William George. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/21/17 (alt)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DOCKET TEXT ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Pursuant to the hearing on May 3, 2015, this motion is moot. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on March 15, 2017. No attached document. (jcw)
March 9, 2017 Filing 60 EXHIBITS A-F filed by Cinemapub re #58 Request for Judicial Notice (Exhibits are 6 separate movies in commercially produced shrink-wrapped DVD boxes - content cannot be uploaded to the CM/ECF electronic docket: disks will be kept in permanent storage) (alt)
March 9, 2017 Filing 59 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Exhibits A, B, C, D, E and F to Request for Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub re #58 Request for Judicial Notice (Anderson, Ross)
March 9, 2017 Filing 58 REQUEST for Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
March 9, 2017 Modification of Docket re #56 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction. Error: Motion requesting 2 possible reliefs was filed with only one relief selected. Correction: Second relief, "Permanent Injunction", has been added to the entry. (alt)
March 6, 2017 Filing 57 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits)(Soderberg, Gregory)
March 4, 2017 Filing 56 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits)(Anderson, Ross). Added MOTION for Permanent Injunction on 3/9/2017 (alt)
March 2, 2017 Filing 55 ANSWER to #54 Amended Complaint filed by Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright.(Soderberg, Gregory) Modified on 3/9/2017: removed excess text (alt)
March 2, 2017 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross) Modified on 3/9/2017: removed excess text (alt)
February 24, 2017 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions and Supporting Memorandum filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Soderberg, Gregory)
February 22, 2017 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #45 Plaintiff's MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. William George and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Declaration of Ross C. Anderson)(Anderson, Ross)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #48 Plaintiff to Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/9/2017. (jds)
February 10, 2017 Filing 50 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #44 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions and Supporting Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
February 10, 2017 Filing 49 Defendant's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #45 Plaintiff's MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. William George and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - George Deposition, p. 9)(Soderberg, Gregory)
February 8, 2017 Filing 48 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended Verified Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, #2 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint)(Anderson, Ross)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order: Motions due by 3/6/2017; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2017 at 02:30 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer; 3-Day Bench Trial set for 8/7/2017 at 08:00 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/2/17 (alt)
January 30, 2017 Filing 46 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct #38 Order on Motion for Scheduling Order, , MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order)(Anderson, Ross)
January 27, 2017 Filing 45 Plaintiff's MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. William George and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Janet M. Conway - Exhibit "1" to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Dr. William George)(Anderson, Ross)
January 27, 2017 Filing 44 Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions and Supporting Memorandum filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Soderberg, Gregory)
December 30, 2016 Filing 43 EXPERT REPORT of Daniel Linz, PhD filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Expert Report of Daniel Linz)(Anderson, Ross)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion for Scheduling Order. Dispositive motions, excluding motions to exclude expert witnesses, are due by February 16, 2017. All other deadlines remain as previously set. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on December 23, 2016. No attached document. (jcw)
December 15, 2016 Filing 41 Stipulated MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Ross)
November 30, 2016 Filing 40 EXPERT REPORT of Daniel Linz, PhD filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response by Daniel Linz, PhD)(Anderson, Ross)
November 30, 2016 Filing 39 EXPERT REPORT of Dr. William H. George Counter Expert Report filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Counter Expert Report)(Soderberg, Gregory)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Expert Discovery due by 12/30/2016. Motions due by 1/27/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2017 at 02:30 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. 3-Day Bench Trial set for 7/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/3/16 (alt)
October 31, 2016 Filing 37 EXPERT REPORT of Dr. William H. George filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Expert Report of Dr. George, #2 Exhibit B Dr. Georges CV, #3 Exhibit C Compensation to be paid to Dr. George)(Soderberg, Gregory)
October 31, 2016 Filing 36 EXPERT REPORT of Bishop, Linz, and Parker filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Attachments: #1 Expert Report of Bishop, #2 Expert Report of Linz, #3 Expert Report of Parker)(Anderson, Ross)
October 6, 2016 Filing 35 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct #30 Order on Motion for Scheduling Order, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soderberg, Gregory) Modified on 10/18/2016: updated motion relief (alt)
September 7, 2016 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory M. Soderberg on behalf of All Defendants (Soderberg, Gregory)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/6/16 (alt)
September 6, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE OF ERROR re #29 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. The attached document is not a motion; it is only a proposed order. Motions and orders are to be formatted as separate documents per DUCivR 10-1 and only actual motions are to be filed using the "Motion" filing event. Entry will be marked as incorrect. (alt)
September 2, 2016 Filing 31 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: Bench Trial reset for Monday, 6/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. (moved from 6/20/2017 to have trial begin on a Monday) (asb)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Amended Scheduling Order. Expert Discovery due by 12/15/2016. Motions due by 1/15/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2017 at 02:30 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. 3-Day Bench Trial set for 6/20/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/1/16 (alt)
September 1, 2016 Filing 29 ERROR: DOCUMENT IS NOT A MOTION - Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Cinemapub. (Conway, Janet) Modified on 9/6/2016: added error text (alt)
August 30, 2016 Filing 28 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct #24 Scheduling Order, and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolf, David) Modified on 9/1/2016: updated motion relief (alt)
August 22, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet M. Conway on behalf of Cinemapub (Conway, Janet)
August 19, 2016 Filing 26 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Ross C. Anderson replacing Marshall McClellan Thompson as counsel on behalf of Cinemapub. (Anderson, Ross)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DOCKET TEXT ORDER - The court orders the parties to follow the Short Form Discovery Motion procedure as outlined in the attached document in this case for all discovery disputes arising after this date. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 6/9/2016. (jds)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/1/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2016. Expert Discovery due by 11/15/2016. Motions due by 12/15/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2017 at 02:30 PM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. 3-Day Bench Trial set for 5/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 6/3/16 (alt)
June 3, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #21 MOTION for Scheduling Order, #22 MOTION for Scheduling Order. Neither entry is attached to a motion. Both consist of proposed orders. Only actual motions are to be e-filed using the "Motion" filing event. The clerk has terminated the non-motions to remove them from the pending motions report. The entries will be marked as erroneous. (alt)
May 23, 2016 Filing 22 ERROR: NOT A MOTION - MOTION for Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Douglas, Parker) Modified on 6/3/2016: added error text (alt)
May 19, 2016 Filing 21 ERROR: NOT A MOTION - MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Douglas, Parker) Modified on 6/3/2016: added error text (alt)
May 19, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re: Initial SchedulingThe court's IPT Clerk will now set the case for the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference (asb)
May 18, 2016 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright.(Wolf, David) Modified on 9/19/2016: removed unnecessary text (alt)
May 13, 2016 Filing 18 ERRATA to #14 Attorney Planning Meeting filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright . (Douglas, Parker)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re administrative actions/enforcement actions against Brewvies. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/6/16 (alt)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Correct Spacing and Capitalization of Plaintiff Name: Plaintiff name now appears as Cinemapub. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 5/6/16 (alt)
May 6, 2016 Modification of Docket re #15 Notice of Filing. Error: Filer repeated title of filing event instead of describing what they were filing. Correction: Docket entry text has been corrected to indicate what was being filed, "Proposed Order re 5/3/16 hearing". (alt)
May 6, 2016 Modification of Docket re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Permanent Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Error: Motion requesting 3 possible reliefs was filed with only one relief selected. Correction: Second and third reliefs, "Permanent Injunction" and "Preliminary Injunction" have been added to the entry. (alt)
May 5, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING of Proposed Order re 5/3/16 hearing filed by Plaintiff Cinema Pub. (Anderson, Ross) Modified on 5/6/2016: corrected entry text (alt)
May 3, 2016 Filing 14 REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Douglas, Parker)
May 3, 2016 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Nuffer: Status Conference held on 5/3/2016. Counsel present for parties. Discussion heard on the plaintiff's motion for TRO/PI. Based on the declaration of Salvador Petilos [10-4] paragraphs 7(a) and (b), the DABC has stayed their action until pendency of the federal court complaint, and will take no enforcement until pendency of the federal court complaint. Based on that representation, the parties have agreed that the motion for TRO/PI needs no decision at this time. The parties will work to agree upon an attorney planning meeting report and submit a proposed schedule. Parties have agreed that cross motions for summary judgment are anticipated, and will be filed no later than 12/15/2016 (likely earlier than that date). Parties will also draft a proposed order of today's proceedings and submit to the court. Court adjourned. Attorney for Plaintiff: Ross Anderson, Attorney for Defendant: Parker Douglas, David Wolf. Court Reporter: Kelly Hicken.(Time Start: 11:00, Time End: 11:24, Room 3.100.)(asb)
April 29, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING: (Notice generated by Nuffer chambers) Status Conference set for 5/3/2016 at 11:00 AM in Rm 3.100 before Judge David Nuffer. This is not a motion hearing. (DN) Modified on 4/30/2016 (DN).
April 29, 2016 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support and Motion for Preliminary Injunction And Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiff Cinema Pub. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Randall Miller, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Ross C. Anderson)(Anderson, Ross)
April 29, 2016 Filing 10 RESPONSE re 9 Order on Motion for TRO,,, filed by Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Douglas, Parker)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER taking under advisement #6 Motion for TRO. The following shall be filed by 9:00 p.m. tonight: (1) Plaintiff reply to the limited issues raised in Defendants limited #8 response; and (2) clarification from the DABC as to what the exact request was from Respondent Cinema Pub LLC dba Brewvies. That is, if a stay was requested, how long was the stay requested for. The DABCs Stay Order is nonspecific as to the length of the stay. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on April 29, 2016. No attached document. (ks)
April 29, 2016 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Memorandum in Support and Motion for Preliminary Injunction And Permanent Injunction filed by Defendants Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Douglas, Parker)
April 28, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION to Approve Stipulation Between the Parties to Correct Spacing and Capitalization of Plaintiff's Name in Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Cinema Pub. (Anderson, Ross)
April 28, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Permanent Injunction, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Cinema Pub. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A: Affidavit of Randall Miller, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B: Proposed Order for Expedited Treatment of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit C: Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(Anderson, Ross). Added MOTION for Permanent Injunction, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and corrected entry text on 5/6/2016 (alt)
April 28, 2016 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cinema Pub as to All Defendants. (Anderson, Ross)
April 27, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David N. Wolf on behalf of All Defendants (Wolf, David)
April 24, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Parker Douglas on behalf of All Defendants (Douglas, Parker)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/20/16 (alt)
April 19, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven B. Bateman, S. Neal Berube, Kathleen McConkie Collinwood, Nina McDermott, Cade Meier, John T. Nielsen, Salvador D. Petilos, Amanda Smith, Olivia Vela Agraz, Jeffrey Wright (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4681071639) filed by Cinema Pub. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet 1) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (dla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cinemapub v. Petilos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petilos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Nielsen
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Gregory M. Soderberg
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvador D. Petilos
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Gregory M. Soderberg
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven B. Bateman
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Gregory M. Soderberg
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina McDermott
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Gregory M. Soderberg
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Smith
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Gregory M. Soderberg
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cade Meier
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Gregory M. Soderberg
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Vela Agraz
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Gregory M. Soderberg
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen McConkie Collinwood
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Gregory M. Soderberg
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Wright
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Gregory M. Soderberg
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Neal Berube
Represented By: David N. Wolf
Represented By: Gregory M. Soderberg
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinemapub
Represented By: Ross C. Anderson
Represented By: Janet M. Conway
Represented By: Marshall McClellan Thompson
Represented By: Vanessa R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinemapub LLC doing business as Brewvies
Represented By: Ross C. Anderson
Represented By: Janet M. Conway
Represented By: Marshall McClellan Thompson
Represented By: Vanessa R. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?