Taylor v. Russell et al

Plaintiff: Roy Dean Taylor
Defendant: Brandon Russell and Scott Paul
Case Number: 2:2016cv00961
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: Denying 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Denying 24 Motion to Amend/Correct; Adopting Judge Warners Report and Recommendations re 22 Report and Recommendations as to 18 Amended Complaint filed by Roy Dean Taylor. The Court Dismisses this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 12/19/2018. (kpf)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER: denying 17 Motion to Consolidate Cases. denying 19 Motion for TRO. Both motions are denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 07/11/2018. (kpf)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER: Plaintiff must within thirty days cure the Complaint's deficiencies noted above. The Clerk's Office shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide with a form complaint and habeas pet ition for Plaintiff to use should he choose to file an amended complaint or habeas corpus petition. If Plaintiff fails to time cure the above deficiencies according to this Order's instructions, this action will be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/18/2016. (kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Dean Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?