Zemaitiene v. Salt Lake County et al
Plaintiff: Kristina Zemaitiene
Defendant: Salt Lake County, James Winder, Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake, Taylorsville City, Tracy Wyant, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Joel Knighton and Denise Lovendahl
Case Number: 2:2017cv00007
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER ADOPTING 77 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Accordingly, the court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (ECF No. 73 ) and grants Defendant Off-Duty Services' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 72 ). Plaintiff's claims against Off-Duty Services are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 10/20/2020. (eat)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING 62 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS granting the 52 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Salt Lake County, Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake, James Winder, Taylorsville City, Tracy Wyant, Joel Knighton, and Denise Lovendahl; and granting the 53 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Rick Ricks and Melanie Perry. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/24/2020. (eat)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying without prejudice Defendant's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Default Judgment; and granting Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file with the court the amended complaint attached to the Motion to Amend within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/1/2018. (eat)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 4 Motion for Service of Process. The court will screen Plaintiffs complaint and determine whether it should be served on the named defendants. It is unnecessary for Plaintiff to take any action to trigger that process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 3/27/17. (dla)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zemaitiene v. Salt Lake County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Zemaitiene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt Lake County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Winder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Police Department of Greater Salt Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylorsville City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Wyant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Knighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Lovendahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?