ATI Titanium v. US Magnesium
Plaintiff: ATI Titanium
Defendant: US Magnesium
Case Number: 2:2017cv00923
Filed: August 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Tooele
Presiding Judge: Dee Benson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 404 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER: 1) ATI's Motion to Exclude Mr. Hoffman 318 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 2) USMG's Motion to Exclude Mr. Nelson 333 is DENIED; and 3) USMG's Motion to Exclude Mr. Stanton 327 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 2/17/21. (dla)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 241 Motion to Amend/Correct Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 5/22/2020. (lnp)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 108 Motion to Dismiss Party Renco Group, The (a New York corporation); denying 133 Motion to Dismiss Allegheny; finding as moot 151 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery. The evidentiary objections 160 and 168 are OVERRULED at this time. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 4/19/2019. (mas)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 114 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 1/29/2019. (mas)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 94 Motion for Short Term Discovery. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, US Mag shall provide a complete response to Interrogatory No. 15's request to "identify by specific reference and citation to the contractual provision or provisions allegedly breached or anticipatorily breached" by ATI. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/19/2018. (mas)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Short Term Discovery/Motion to Re-designate Attorneys Eyes Only Documents; granting 75 Motion for Short Term Discovery/Motion to Compel. US Mag shall provide full responses to RFP Nos. 3 and 913 within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/3/2018. (mas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATI Titanium v. US Magnesium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATI Titanium
Represented By: Bryon J. Benevento
Represented By: Adam C. Buck
Represented By: Kimberly Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Magnesium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?