Inception Mining et al v. Danzig et al
Plaintiff: Inception Mining, Michael Ahlin and Trent D'Ambrosio
Defendant: Danzig, Elliott Foxcroft and Brett Bertolami
Case Number: 2:2017cv00944
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: David Nuffer
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 45 Motion for More Definite Statement. Defendants are to file an amended counterclaim which is consistent with the Memorandum Decision and Order by no later than 12/14/18. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 11/29/18 (alt)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as to Plaintiffs' claim that the Individual Plaintiffs are not proper parties to the Boston Arbitration: The Boston Arbitration is preliminarily enjoined as to the Individual Plaintiffs. Dfts' brief on the remaining 8 Motion for Permanent Injunction issue due by 4/30/18. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 4/23/18 (alt)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and staying in part 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction: brief re 8 Motion for Permanent Injunction due by 3/12/18. Parties are directed to jointly file a report stating the status of the NC Case upon issuance of a ruling on 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 2/27/18 (alt)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: determination is stayed as to Plaintiff's second claim and remaining portions of third claim. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/24/18 (alt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inception Mining et al v. Danzig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inception Mining
Represented By: Val R. Antczak
Represented By: Barbara K. Polich
Represented By: George C.M. Poulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ahlin
Represented By: Val R. Antczak
Represented By: Barbara K. Polich
Represented By: George C.M. Poulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent D'Ambrosio
Represented By: Val R. Antczak
Represented By: Barbara K. Polich
Represented By: George C.M. Poulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danzig
Represented By: Gary R. Henrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Foxcroft
Represented By: Gary R. Henrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Bertolami
Represented By: Gary R. Henrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?