Major et al v. Valdera Development et al

Plaintiff: Michael R. Major, James D. Granum, Jone Law Koford and Allan Carter
Defendant: Valdera Development, Diversified Management Services, Valdera Investment Partners, DMS Services, Lynn Padan and Alan Wright
Case Number: 2:2017cv00974
Filed: August 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J. Furse
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER awarding defendants $15,237.00 in attorneys' fees and $499.50 in costs for the defense of Plaintiffs' first and fourth causes of action. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 3/5/19 (alt)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part 50 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs: Defendants are entitled to an award of the reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred in their defense of Plaintiffs' first and fourth causes of action. Declaration of dfts' counsel re apportionment of fees and costs to be filed by no later than 2/8/19. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 1/31/19 (alt)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plainti ffs' refiling their state law claims in state court. This court will retain jurisdiction over a motion for attorney fees filed pursuant to the federal and local rules. IT IS FURTHER HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' oral request, made at the August 10, 2018 hearing, for leave to amend their Complaint is DENIED.The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge David Nuffer on 9/10/2018. (jwt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Major et al v. Valdera Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Major
Represented By: Steven R. Bangerter
Represented By: Daniel P. Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D. Granum
Represented By: Steven R. Bangerter
Represented By: Daniel P. Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jone Law Koford
Represented By: Steven R. Bangerter
Represented By: Daniel P. Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Carter
Represented By: Steven R. Bangerter
Represented By: Daniel P. Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valdera Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valdera Investment Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMS Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Padan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?