Salt Lake City Corporation v. Sekisui SPR Americas et al
Plaintiff: Salt Lake City Corporation
Defendant: Sekisui SPR Americas and Sekisui Rib Loc Australia Pty
Case Number: 2:2017cv01095
Filed: September 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Jill N. Parrish
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 149 Motion to Dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 8/26/2020. (nl)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 80 Sekisui Australias motion to dismiss the causes of action asserted against it in Salt Lake Citys Second Amended Complaint. Dismissal is with prejudice. ; granting 79 Sekisui Americas moti on to dismiss the causes of action asserted against it in Salt Lake Citys Second Amended Complaint. Dismissal is with prejudice. ; granting 84 HydraTechs motion to dismiss the causes of action asserted against it in Salt Lake Citys Second Amended Complaint. Dismissal is with prejudice. ; granting in part and denying in part 105 Sekisui Australias and Sekisui Americas motion to dismiss the crossclaims asserted against them in Southwests Amended Crosscomplaint. ; denying Salt Lake Citys and Southwests motions to certify questions to the Utah Supreme Court 93 and 121 . Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/26/2019. (jds)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Dismiss Southwest Pipeline and Trenchless Corp.s crossclaims. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 11/16/2018. (jds)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 28 Sekisui Americas Rule 12(b)(6) motion to dismiss the claims against it ; granting in part and denying in part 29 Sekisui Australias Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in par t 35 HydraTechs Motion to Dismiss. Dismissal of Salt Lake Citys claims against Sekisui Americas, Sekisui Australia, and HydraTech shall be without prejudice. Salt Lake City has leave from the court to file an amended complaint by October 19 that addresses the deficiencies identified in this Order, if it is able to do so. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/28/2018. (jds)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salt Lake City Corporation v. Sekisui SPR Americas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salt Lake City Corporation
Represented By: Catherine L. Brabson
Represented By: Craig C. Coburn
Represented By: Jack W. Reed
Represented By: E. Russell Vetter
Represented By: Samantha E. Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sekisui SPR Americas
Represented By: Kamie F. Brown
Represented By: Matthew M. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sekisui Rib Loc Australia Pty
Represented By: Kamie F. Brown
Represented By: Matthew M. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?