Christensen v. Baithwaite et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Jeffrey Christensen
Defendant: Robert Baithwaite, Brad Bown, Jeff Nielsen, Ross Bailey, Gretchen Nunnly, Dale Christensen, Jessie Larsen, Chad Imlay, Brandon Brown and Amanda Bennitt
Case Number: 2:2017cv01123
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Sanpete
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER DISMISSING SOME DEFENDANTS & CLAIMS & REQUIRING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON REMAINING DEFENDANTS. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/06/2021. (kpf)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Memorandum Decision & Order Dismissing some Defendants & Claims & Requiring Service Of Process on Remaining Defendants: Bailey, Brown, K. Nunley, and Robbins are dismissed. The Clerk of Court shall mail each remaining dfts: Bennett, Bown, Braithwaite, Christensen, Gates, Imlay, Nielsen and G. Nunley. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/01/2021. (kpf)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER to Cure Deficient Second Amended Complaint. See Order for details. THE COURT WILL NOT ACCEPT ANY FILINGS FROM PLAINTIFF EXCEPT FOR A THIRD, AND FINAL, AMENDED COMPLAINT UNTIL FURTHER FILINGS ARE SPECIFICALLY INVITED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 5/30/2019. (las)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENT AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 42 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 55 Motion to Stay. THE COURT WILL NOT ACCEPT ANY FILINGS FROM PLAINTIFF EXCEPT FOR A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNTIL FURTHER FILINGS ARE SPECIFICALLY INVITED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/29/19. (jmr)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM DECISION & ORDER denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 7 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner); denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 9 Motion to dissemination of information. Defendants have not been served so there is not need for Plaintiff to disseminate documents for the foreseeable future. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 1/8/2018. (kpf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen v. Baithwaite et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Jeffrey Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Baithwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Bown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Nunnly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Imlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Bennitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?