Rodriguez-Cayro v. Rodriquez-Cayro
Plaintiff: Kyli Rodriguez-Cayro
Defendant: Narciso Alejandro Rodriquez-Cayro
Counter_claimant: Narciso Alejandro Rodriquez-Cayro
Counter_defendant: Kyli Rodriguez-Cayro
Thirdparty_defendant: Marnie Lynn Antonik
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Narciso Alejandro Rodriquez-Cayro
Case Number: 2:2017cv01197
Filed: November 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Jill N. Parrish
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION RE: NARROWING THE SCOPE OF THE SUBPOENAS -granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Short Term Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are to meet and confer and submit to the court a proposed protective order governing discovery in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 5/20/19. (jmr)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Counterclaim Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Denying as Moot Third-Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: (1) The court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART [3 2] Kyli's motion to dismiss. The court dismisses Narciso's counterclaim for abuse of process. The court further dismisses Narciso's counterclaim for wrongful use of civil proceedings to the extent that it is based upon this Utah litiga tion. The portion of the wrongful use of civil proceedings claim that is based upon the Pennsylvania proceeding remains in this lawsuit. (2) The court DENIES AS MOOT 40 Marnie's motion to dismiss the third-party claims against her. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 9/19/18. (dla)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why the Case Should Not be Transferred to State Court Because This Court Lacks Jurisdiction. Accordingly, the defendant, Narciso Rodriguez-Cayro, is hereby ORDERED to show cause why this action should not be transf erred to state court because the Notice of Removal was not timely filed. Furthermore, the defendant must allege his own domicile as well as the plaintiffs domicile at the time that the initial Complaint was filed. See Siloam Springs Hotel,781 F.3d at 1238. The defendant must respond by January 5, 2018. A failure to respond will result in an order transferring the case back to state court. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/12/2017. (jwt)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Cayro v. Rodriquez-Cayro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyli Rodriguez-Cayro
Represented By: Victor A. Sipos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Narciso Alejandro Rodriquez-Cayro
Represented By: Anne Taylor Freeland
Represented By: Melinda A. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Narciso Alejandro Rodriquez-Cayro
Represented By: Anne Taylor Freeland
Represented By: Melinda A. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kyli Rodriguez-Cayro
Represented By: Victor A. Sipos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Marnie Lynn Antonik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Narciso Alejandro Rodriquez-Cayro
Represented By: Anne Taylor Freeland
Represented By: Melinda A. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?