Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. JAFX
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: JAFX
Case Number: 2:2018cv00598
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dustin B Pead
Referring Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Mulreany, Timothy)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mulreany, Timothy)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to JAFX. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to JAFX. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A). Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 07/30/2018. (tdp)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants No Filing Fee filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups (Mulreany, Timothy)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Clark Waddoups. Plaintiff Commodity Futures Trading Commission is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA)NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. JAFX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAFX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Timothy J. Mulreany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?