ProLung v. Eror et al
Plaintiff: ProLung
Defendant: Weild and Co, Todd Morgan, Michael Christensen, Steven C Eror, United Shareholders of ProLung, Eric Sokol, Steven C. Eror, Richard Serbin, Ron Dunford, Brian Loveridge and Don Patterson
Case Number: 2:2018cv00613
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0078 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 31 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ProLung as to Don Patterson served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Pehrson, Chad)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #19 Amended Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Michael Christensen answer due 10/24/2018; Steven C. Eror answer due 10/24/2018; Todd Morgan answer due 10/24/2018; Weild and Co answer due 10/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/26/2018. (las)
September 26, 2018 Filing 29 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Michael Christensen, Steven C. Eror, Todd Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order on Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time)(Mellem, Alissa) Modified on 9/26/2018 corrected motion type (las).
September 21, 2018 Filing 28 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard Serbin. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 27 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Ron Dunford. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 26 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Don Patterson. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 25 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Brian Loveridge. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 21, 2018 Filing 24 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Eric Sokol. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
September 18, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Lahti on behalf of Weild and Co (Lahti, Brian)
September 18, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Von Maack on behalf of Weild and Co (Von Maack, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adrienne M. Ward for Michael Christensen,Adrienne M. Ward for Steven C. Eror,Adrienne M. Ward for Todd Morgan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/17/2018. (las)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas S. Hirst for Michael Christensen,Nicholas S. Hirst for Steven C. Eror,Nicholas S. Hirst for Todd Morgan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 9/17/2018. (las)
September 14, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by ProLung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Clark, Robert)
September 14, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas S. Hirst , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3103541, filed by Defendants Michael Christensen, Steven C. Eror, Todd Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Mellem, Alissa)
September 14, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adrienne M. Ward , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3103537, filed by Defendants Michael Christensen, Steven C. Eror, Todd Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit Electronic Case Filing Registration Form, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Mellem, Alissa)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DOCKET TEXT ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time and GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause appearing, the Court GRANTS the Motions for Extension of Time and ORDERS that Defendants Weild & Co. LLC, Steven C. Eror, Todd Morgan & Michael Christensen may have up to and including September 28, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/29/2018. No attached document. (nas)
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint against Defendants Steven C. Eror, Todd Morgan and Michael Christiansen filed by Plaintiff ProLung. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pehrson, Chad)
August 28, 2018 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint against Defendant Weild & Co. filed by Plaintiff ProLung. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pehrson, Chad)
August 28, 2018 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by ProLung.Steven C. Eror served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Pehrson, Chad)
August 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alissa M. Mellem on behalf of Michael Christensen, Steven C. Eror, Todd Morgan (Mellem, Alissa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik A. Christiansen on behalf of Michael Christensen, Steven C. Eror, Todd Morgan (Christiansen, Erik)
August 16, 2018 Filing 10 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ProLung as to Todd Morgan served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018. (Pehrson, Chad)
August 10, 2018 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ProLung as to Michael Christensen served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018. (Clark, Robert)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ProLung as to Weild and Co served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018. (Clark, Robert)
August 7, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Weild and Co. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Todd Morgan. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Steven C. Eror. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Christensen. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/1/2018. (las)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Michael Christensen, Steven C Eror, Todd Morgan, United Shareholders of ProLung, Weild and Co (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3066652) filed by ProLung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Cover) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Clark, Robert)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff ProLung is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ProLung v. Eror et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weild and Co
Represented By: Christopher M. Von Maack
Represented By: Brian E. Lahti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Morgan
Represented By: Nicholas S. Hirst
Represented By: Alissa M. Mellem
Represented By: Adrienne M. Ward
Represented By: Erik A. Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Christensen
Represented By: Nicholas S. Hirst
Represented By: Alissa M. Mellem
Represented By: Adrienne M. Ward
Represented By: Erik A. Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C Eror
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Shareholders of ProLung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Sokol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C. Eror
Represented By: Nicholas S. Hirst
Represented By: Alissa M. Mellem
Represented By: Adrienne M. Ward
Represented By: Erik A. Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Serbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Dunford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Loveridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ProLung
Represented By: Chad S. Pehrson
Represented By: Robert S. Clark
Represented By: Steven R. Glauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?