Cobblewood v. Barnes Banking et al
Plaintiff: Cobblewood
Defendant: Barnes Banking and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00634
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Paul M Warner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER TO COMPLY WITH ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE. The deadline to comply with Paragraph 2 of #4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE has expired. The parties are hereby ordered to comply with Paragraph 2 within fourteen (14) days after the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/01/2018. (docket text order; no attached document) (jcd)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 Modification of Docket: Error: Order entered in incorrect case. Please disregard. re #7 Order to Propose Schedule. (las)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Entry Error ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/15/2018. (las) Modified on 8/15/2018 adding error text (las).
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Quash Service, MOTION to Vacate Default Certificate and Default Judgment, MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Originally filed in State Court on 6/11/2018) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron Moore)(las)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 File Received from 4th District Court, Utah County consisting of docket sheet and documents filed in state court. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Return of Service, #3 Return of Service, #4 Motion for Default Certificate, #5 Proposed Default Certificate, #6 Request to Submit, #7 Default Certificate, #8 Motion Default Judgmenr, #9 Proposed Default Judgment, #10 Declaration, #11 Request to Submit, #12 Default Judgment, #13 Notice of Judgment, #14 Appearance of Counsel, #15 Motion to Quash, #16 Declaration of Aaron Moore, #17 Lis Pendens, #18 Notice of Removal) (las)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 8/14/2018. (las)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Cobblewood, Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (tlh)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th District Court Utah County, case number 180400461, No Filing Fee No Filing Fee filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit all state court filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner (Tilt, Bradley)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner. Defendant Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) No filing fee, USA .NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh) Modified on 8/13/2018 by correcting text (tlh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobblewood v. Barnes Banking et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes Banking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Sara E. Bouley
Represented By: Bradley L. Tilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cobblewood
Represented By: Kristen J. Overton
Represented By: Michael A. Gehret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?