Hendriks v. Auto Owners Insurance
Plaintiff: John Hendriks
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance and Nemani R. Tuisavura
Case Number: 2:2018cv00638
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Utah
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Evelyn J Furse
Referring Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of To Submit for Decision Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to State Court by John Hendriks re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Third District - Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support (Petty, Ralph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Third District - Salt Lake County and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff John Hendriks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Petty, Ralph)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Hendriks as to Nemani R. Tuisavura served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Petty, Ralph)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company's ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint filed by Auto Owners Insurance.(Nelson, Anna)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Nemani R. Tuisavura. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (tlh)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Auto Owners Insurance. New Defendants: Nemani R. Tuisavura. filed by John Hendriks. (Petty, Ralph)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 8/15/18. (jlw)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Auto Owners Insurance, Plaintiff John Hendriks. (tlh)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 8/14/2018. (tco)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 180902185, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3079020) filed by Auto Owners Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Ted Stewart (Nelson, Anna)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Ted Stewart. Defendant Auto Owners Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (tlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendriks v. Auto Owners Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hendriks
Represented By: Ralph C. Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance
Represented By: Anna Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nemani R. Tuisavura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?